This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 09:58:27 (UTC).

Sandi v. Quick

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Sandi filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Quick. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leigh Martin May. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01602

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Carlos Sandi

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Susan Quick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Odis Williams

Attorney at The Law Offices of Odis Williams, PC

Building 20, Suite 300, 1640 Powers Ferry Road

Marietta, GA 30067

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Nicholas Booth

Attorney at O'Dell & O'Neal Attorneys

506 Roswell Street, Suite 210

Marietta, GA 30060

Justin B. O'Dell

Attorney at O'Dell & O'Neal Attorneys

506 Roswell Street, Suite 210

Marietta, GA 30060

 

Court Documents

11 #2

Exhibit B

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Susan Quick. (eop) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice,with Brief In Support by Susan Quick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(O'Dell, Justin) Modified on 7/10/2019 to edit event and text (tmf). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Persons by Susan Quick. (O'Dell, Justin) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Carlos Sandi (Williams, Odis) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/11/2019. (btql) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Counsel are hereby ORDERED to file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan required by Local Rule 16.2 within 14 days of entry of this Order, or SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to LR 41.3. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/9/2019. (tmf) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

11 #3

Exhibit C

#5

(#5) Return of Service Executed by Carlos Sandi. Susan Quick served on 4/28/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Williams, Odis) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

11 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 10/15/2019.), COUNTERCLAIM against Carlos Sandi with Jury Demand by Susan Quick.(O'Dell, Justin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#12

(#12) AMENDED ANSWER to Specifically Respond to Plaintiff's #9 Amended Complaint, by Susan Quick. (O'Dell, Justin) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carlos Sandi. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8568332) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#9

(#9) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Susan Quickwith Jury Demand filed by Carlos Sandi.(Williams, Odis) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Susan Quick.(O'Dell, Justin) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED ANSWER to Specifically Respond to Plaintiff's #9 Amended Complaint, by Susan Quick. (O'Dell, Justin) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notification of Docket Correction re #11 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice,with Brief In Support by Susan Quick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(O'Dell, Justin) Modified on 7/10/2019 to edit event and text (tmf). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice,with Brief In Support by Susan Quick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(O'Dell, Justin) Modified on 7/10/2019 to edit event and text (tmf). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Counsel are hereby ORDERED to file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan required by Local Rule 16.2 within 14 days of entry of this Order, or SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to LR 41.3. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/9/2019. (tmf) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Susan Quickwith Jury Demand filed by Carlos Sandi.(Williams, Odis) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Susan Quick.(O'Dell, Justin) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Interested Persons by Susan Quick. (O'Dell, Justin) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 10/15/2019.), COUNTERCLAIM against Carlos Sandi with Jury Demand by Susan Quick.(O'Dell, Justin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return of Service Executed by Carlos Sandi. Susan Quick served on 4/28/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Williams, Odis) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/11/2019. (btql) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint, filed by Carlos Sandi (Williams, Odis) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Susan Quick. (eop) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carlos Sandi. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8568332) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.