This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:45:32 (UTC).

Sanders v. Walmart Stores East, LP

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Sanders filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wallace Capel, Jr and William Keith Watkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00135

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Wallace Capel, Jr

Presiding Judge

William Keith Watkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Izola Sanders

Defendant

Walmart Stores East, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer Dunn Batson Cooley

Attorney at The Law Firm of Chancey & Cooley, LLC

P O Drawer 2500

Phenix City, AL 36868

Stephen Joseph Hodges

Attorney at Phillips Branch & Hodges

Po Box 2808

Columbus, GA 31906

Defendant Attorneys

Mignon M. DeLashmet

Attorney at DeLashmet & Marchand PC

P O Box 2047

Mobile, AL 36652

Wilbur Pemble DeLashmet

Attorney at DeLashmet & Marchand, P.C.

Po Box 2047

Mobile, AL 36652

Chad Christopher Marchand

Attorney at DeLashmet & Marchand, P.C.

Po Box 2047

Mobile, AL 36652

Mignon Mestayer DeLashmet

Attorney at DeLashmet & Marchand PC

P O Box 2047

Mobile, AL 36652

Nathan L. Burrow

Attorney at Galloway Law Firm

2510 14Th Street; Suite 910

Gulfport, MS 39501

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Exhibit A

9 #1

Standing Order and Format

#16

(#16) (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES RE: NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Izola Sanders by Walmart Stores East, LP.(DeLashmet, Wilbur) Modified on 4/10/2019 (am, ). (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#14

(#14) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr as referral judge. Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (am, ) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

1 #6

fee receipt

#11

(#11) (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES RE: NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Izola Sanders by Walmart Stores East, LP.(DeLashmet, Wilbur) Modified on 4/9/2019 (am, ). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #16 Notice to Take Deposition which is hereby STRICKEN Pursuant to Local Rules re: Non-Filing of Civil Discovery. (am, ) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

1 #1

state court complaint

1 #2

answer

#10

(#10) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Izola Sanders re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Hodges, Stephen) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #11 , #12 , and #13 Notices to Take Deposition which are hereby STRICKEN Pursuant to Local Rules re: Non-Filing of Civil Discovery. (am, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (all parties) Izola Sanders, Walmart Stores East, LP. (djy, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

1 #5

civil cover sheet

#12

(#12) (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES RE: NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Izola Sanders by Walmart Stores East, LP.(DeLashmet, Wilbur) Modified on 4/9/2019 (am, ). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Izola Sanders; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#13

(#13) (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES RE: NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Izola Sanders by Walmart Stores East, LP.(DeLashmet, Wilbur) Modified on 4/9/2019 (am, ). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#1

NOTICE to state court by Walmart Stores East, LP re filing of #1 Notice of Removal (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #16 Notice to Take Deposition which is hereby STRICKEN Pursuant to Local Rules re: Non-Filing of Civil Discovery. (am, ) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES RE: NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Izola Sanders by Walmart Stores East, LP.(DeLashmet, Wilbur) Modified on 4/10/2019 (am, ). (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #11 , #12 , and #13 Notices to Take Deposition which are hereby STRICKEN Pursuant to Local Rules re: Non-Filing of Civil Discovery. (am, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr as referral judge. Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (am, ) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES RE: NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Izola Sanders by Walmart Stores East, LP.(DeLashmet, Wilbur) Modified on 4/9/2019 (am, ). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES RE: NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Izola Sanders by Walmart Stores East, LP.(DeLashmet, Wilbur) Modified on 4/9/2019 (am, ). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES RE: NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Izola Sanders by Walmart Stores East, LP.(DeLashmet, Wilbur) Modified on 4/9/2019 (am, ). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Izola Sanders re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Hodges, Stephen) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Izola Sanders; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Format)(am, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: Directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than 4/25/2019, as further set out in Order; further ORDERING that any party wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction shall complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 4/25/2019, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/4/2019. (am, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Walmart Stores East, LP. (Burrow, Nathan) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Walmart Stores East, LP. (DeLashmet, Wilbur). Modified on 3/4/2019 to clarify text to reflect as satisfying #4 notice of deficiency (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Walmart Stores East, LP; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Izola Sanders; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (all parties) Izola Sanders, Walmart Stores East, LP. (djy, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE to state court by Walmart Stores East, LP re filing of #1 Notice of Removal (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Walmart Stores East, LP.(djy, ) Modified on 2/22/2019 to clarify text to reflect that NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 . (djy, ). (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Izola Sanders. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, ). (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT against Walmart Stores East, LP, filed by Izola Sanders. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ).(djy, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Stores East, LP from Circuit Court of Russell County, Alabama, case number 57-CV-2018-900313.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602052435) (Attachments: #1 state court complaint, #2 answer, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 civil cover sheet, #6 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.