This case was last updated from PACER on 09/06/2021 at 09:50:40 (UTC).

Sanders v. U.S. Bank Trust National Association et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Sanders filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against U S Bank Trust National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David L. Horan and A. Joe Fish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01589

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David L. Horan

Presiding Judge

A. Joe Fish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terrelton Sanders

Defendants

U.S. Bank Trust National Association as Trustee of the Chalet Series IV Trust

U.S. Bank Trust National Association

SN Servicing Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Gannon Helstowski

Attorney at J Gannon Helstowski Law Firm

5209 Heitage Avenue, Suite 510

Colleyville, TX 76034

Defendant Attorneys

Ray L Vela

Attorney at Anderson Vela LLP

4920 Westport Drive

The Colony, TX 75056

Richard Ernest Anderson

Attorney at Anderson Vela LLP

4920 Westport Dr

The Colony, TX 75056

Richard Ernest Anderson,

Attorney at Anderson Vela LLP

4920 Westport Dr

The Colony, TX 75056

Ray L Vela,

Attorney at Anderson Vela LLP

4920 Westport Drive

The Colony, TX 75056

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER ACCEPTING #3 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case is TRANSFERRED to the Fort Worth Division of the Northern District of Texas for random reassignment to a judge resident in that division. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/9/2021) (jmg) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#3

(#3) FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should transfer this action to the Fort Worth Division of this district, the division of this district in which the state action was pending. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/13/2021) (mla) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

1 #10

Exhibit(s)

1 #9

Exhibit(s)

1 #8

Exhibit(s)

1 #7

Exhibit(s)

1 #6

Exhibit(s)

1 #5

Exhibit(s)

1 #4

Exhibit(s)

1 #3

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by U.S. Bank Trust National Association as Trustee of the Chalet Series IV Trust. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12033854) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s)) (Vela, Ray) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCase copied to 4:21cv0933-O. Transfer to Fort Worth Division complete; clerk to set Related Case hyperlink, clear unnecessary flags, etc. (ldm) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER ACCEPTING #3 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case is TRANSFERRED to the Fort Worth Division of the Northern District of Texas for random reassignment to a judge resident in that division. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/9/2021) (jmg) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should transfer this action to the Fort Worth Division of this district, the division of this district in which the state action was pending. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/13/2021) (mla) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SN Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank Trust National Association. (See document #1 -10 for image) (axm) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by U.S. Bank Trust National Association as Trustee of the Chalet Series IV Trust. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12033854) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s)) (Vela, Ray) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Ernest Anderson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ray L Vela