This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2022 at 09:38:52 (UTC).

Sanders v. OS Restaurant Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 Sanders filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against OS Restaurant Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steve C. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04778

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steve C. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synasia Sanders

Defendants

OS Restaurant Services, LLC

Outback Steakhouse International, L.P.

Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

A. Lee Parks, Jr

Attorney at Parks Chesin & Walbert, P.C. -Atl

Suite 2600, 75 Fourteenth Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309

Alanna Klein Fischer

Attorney at The Lazzaro Law Firm, LLC

34555 Chagrin Blvd, Suite 250

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Anthony J. Lazzaro

Attorney at The Lazzaro Law Firm, LLC

The Heritage Building, Suite 250

Moreland Hillshartford, OH 44022

Don J. Foty

Attorney at Hodges & Foty, LLP

4409 Montrose Blvd., Suite 200

Houston, TX 77006

John Lawrence Mays

Attorney at Parks Chesin & Walbert, P.C. -Atl

Suite 2600, 75 Fourteenth Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309

Lori M. Griffin

Attorney at The Lazzaro Law Firm, LLC

The Heritage Building, 34555 Chagrin Blvd.

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

 

Court Documents

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Anthony J. Lazzaro. Clerk to follow-up by 12/20/2021. (cdg) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) Return of Service Executed by Synasia Sanders. Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Mays, John) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed by Synasia Sanders. OS Restaurant Services, LLC served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Mays, John) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed by Synasia Sanders. Outback Steakhouse International, L.P. served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Mays, John) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to OS Restaurant Services, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Outback Steakhouse International, L.P.. (eop) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Alanna Klein Fischer. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/20/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ddm) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Anthony J. Lazzaro. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/20/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ddm) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Lori M. Griffin Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/20/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rsg) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Alanna Klein Fischer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11459748). Attorney Alanna Klein Fischer added appearing on behalf of Synasia Sanders (cdg) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony J. Lazzaro Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11459698). Attorney Anthony J. Lazzaro added appearing on behalf of Synasia Sanders (cdg) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Lori M. Griffin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11459653). Attorney Lori M. Griffin added appearing on behalf of Synasia Sanders (cdg) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPLICATION for Admission of Alanna Klein Fischer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11459748).by Synasia Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parks, A.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony J. Lazzaro Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11459698).by Synasia Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parks, A.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPLICATION for Admission of Lori M. Griffin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11459653).by Synasia Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parks, A.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Anthony J. Lazzaro. Clerk to follow-up by 12/20/2021. (cdg) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Don J. Foty. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/30/2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ddm) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service Executed by Synasia Sanders. Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Mays, John) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed by Synasia Sanders. OS Restaurant Services, LLC served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Mays, John) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed by Synasia Sanders. Outback Steakhouse International, L.P. served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (Mays, John) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Don J. Foty Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11417749). Attorney Don J. Foty added appearing on behalf of Synasia Sanders (cdg) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION for Admission of Don J. Foty Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11417749). with Brief In Support by Synasia Sanders. (Parks, A.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to OS Restaurant Services, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Outback Steakhouse International, L.P.. (eop) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Synasia Sanders. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11407959) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 11/19/2021 (eop). (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OS RESTAURANT SERVICES LLC DOING BUSINESS AS CARRABBA'S ITALIAN GRILL is a litigant

Latest cases where OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alanna Klein Fischer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Lawrence Mays