This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2021 at 12:31:37 (UTC).

Sanders v. Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority (MARTA) et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 Sanders filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority MARTA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles A. Pannell, Jr and John K. Larkins, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05173

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles A. Pannell, Jr

Referral Judge

John K. Larkins, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keith Sanders

Defendants

Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority (MARTA)

LaShanda Dawkins

Thomas Young

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James E. Rollins, Jr.

Attorney at Schwartz Rollins, LLC

945 East Paces Ferry Road, Suite 2220

Atlanta, GA 30326

Debra E. Schwartz

Attorney at Schwartz Rollins, LLC

945 East Paces Ferry Road, Suite 2220

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#2

(#2) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Waiver of Service -T. Young

1 #5

Notice of Service -T. Young

1 #4

Waiver of Service -L. Dawkins

1 #3

Notice of Service -L. Dawkins

1 #2

Waiver of Service -MARTA

1 #1

Notice of Service -MARTA

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Keith Sanders. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10517762) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service -MARTA, #2 Waiver of Service -MARTA, #3 Notice of Service -L. Dawkins, #4 Waiver of Service -L. Dawkins, #5 Notice of Service -T. Young, #6 Waiver of Service -T. Young, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Keith Sanders. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10517762) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service -MARTA, #2 Waiver of Service -MARTA, #3 Notice of Service -L. Dawkins, #4 Waiver of Service -L. Dawkins, #5 Notice of Service -T. Young, #6 Waiver of Service -T. Young, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less