This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2021 at 08:18:02 (UTC).

Sanders v. Department of Fair Employment and Housing

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Sanders filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Department of Fair Employment and Housing. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-07740

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malaka Sanders

Concord, CA 94520

Defendant

Department of Fair Employment and Housing

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Summons Issued as to Department of Fair Employment and Housing. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#17

(#17) Proposed Summons. (Sanders, Malaka) (Filed on 11/24/2021) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#16

(#16) Fourth MOTION for Entry of Default (Addendum) filed by Malaka Sanders. (Sanders, Malaka) (Filed on 11/24/2021) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

14 #1

Exhibit

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) ORDER RE: THIRD MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; denying #12 Third Motion for Entry of Default. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

12 #1

Summons

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) ORDER RE: SECOND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT re #10 Second MOTION for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/19/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

10 #1

Affidavit

10 #10

Main Document

8 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #3 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Upon Robert Bonta, California State Attorney General on behalf of Defendant Department of Fair Employment and Housing served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#5

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Summons Issued as to Department of Fair Employment and Housing. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CLERK'S NOTICE terminating motion as moot re #16 Fourth MOTION for Entry of Default (Addendum). The #14 Fourth Motion for Entry of Default was declined. See docket 15. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Proposed Summons. (Sanders, Malaka) (Filed on 11/24/2021) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Fourth MOTION for Entry of Default (Addendum) filed by Malaka Sanders. (Sanders, Malaka) (Filed on 11/24/2021) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT. Service does not meet the requirements of California Code of Civil Procedure 416.50(a). See dockets 9, #11 , and #13 .A request for a new summons should be docketed using the event "Proposed Summons." (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #14 )(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Fourth MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Malaka Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sanders, Malaka) (Filed on 11/24/2021) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER RE: THIRD MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; denying #12 Third Motion for Entry of Default. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2021) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Third MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Malaka Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Sanders, Malaka) (Filed on 11/19/2021) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER RE: SECOND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT re #10 Second MOTION for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/19/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Second MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Malaka Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sanders, Malaka) (Filed on 11/17/2021) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT. Service does not meet the requirements of California Code of Civil Procedure 416.50(a), "summons may be served on a public entity by delivering a copy of the summons and of the complaint to the clerk, secretary, president, presiding officer, or other head of its governing body.". (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #8 )(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Malaka Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sanders, Malaka) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #3 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Upon Robert Bonta, California State Attorney General on behalf of Defendant Department of Fair Employment and Housing served on 10/4/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2021) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Department of Fair Employment and Housing. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Malaka Sanders.. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Malaka Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 12/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2022 02:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 YGR - Standing Order, #2 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #3 Standing Orders for All Judges)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Department of Fair Employment and Housing, (Filing Fee: $402.00. Receipt no. 44611017264). Filed by Malaka Sanders. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing Fee Receipt)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING is a litigant