This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2021 at 11:55:42 (UTC).

Sanders v. C E O C L L C et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 Sanders filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against C E O C L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Mark L Hornsby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01544

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Mark L Hornsby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jordan K Sanders

Defendants

K Anderson

City of Shreveport

Ben Raymond

CEOC, LLC doing business as Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture

Jumaraca N Broadway

C E O C L L C doing business as Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture

Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Marshall Rice

Attorney at Rice & Kendig

1030 Kings Hwy

Shreveport, LA 71104

William Fabian Kendig, Jr

Attorney at Rice & Kendig

1030 Kings Hwy

Shreveport, LA 71104

Defendant Attorneys

Nichole Marie Buckle

Attorney at Stroud Carmouche & Buckle

7330 Fern Ave Ste 903

Shreveport, LA 71105

Scott R Wolf

Attorney at Blanchard Walker et al

P O Drawer 1126

Shreveport, LA 71163-1126

Scott R Wolf,

Attorney at Blanchard Walker et al

P O Drawer 1126

Shreveport, LA 71163-1126

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) RULE 26(f) Report by K Anderson, Ben Raymond, City of Shreveport . (aty,Buckle, Nichole) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#11

(#11) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 2/3/2021. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/13/2021. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C E O C L L C, Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture identifying Corporate Parent Eldorado Resorts Inc, Eldorado Shreveport #1 L L C, Eldorado Shreveport #2 L L C for Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture; Corporate Parent Caesars Entertainment Corp for C E O C L L C. (aty,Wolf, Scott) Modified on 12/17/2020 to add other affiliates (Jones, P). (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #8 Answer to Complaint, sent to Scott R Wolf on behalf of Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/30/2020. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jumaraca N Broadway, Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture (incorrectly named as C E O C L L C).(aty,Wolf, Scott) Modified on 12/16/2020 to edit parties (Jones, P). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by K Anderson, Ben Raymond, City of Shreveport.(aty,Buckle, Nichole) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit State Court Record

#6

(#6) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by K Anderson, Ben Raymond, City of Shreveport . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(aty,Buckle, Nichole) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R Wolf on behalf of Jumaraca N Broadway, C E O C L L C (Attorney Scott R Wolf added to party Jumaraca N Broadway(pty:dft), Attorney Scott R Wolf added to party C E O C L L C(pty:dft)) (aty,Wolf, Scott) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/9/2020) (Jones, P). Modified on 12/9/2020 to replace in proper pdf format (Jones, P). (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#4

(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/7/2020. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/4/2020. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

1 #2

Civil cover sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A, Petition & Citation

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 626987-C with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4491218) filed by City of Shreveport, K Anderson, Ben Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Petition & Citation, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Nichole Marie Buckle added to party K Anderson, Ben Raymond, City of Shreveport(pty:dft))(aty,Buckle, Nichole) Modified on 12/4/2020 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 12/04/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RULE 26(f) Report by K Anderson, Ben Raymond, City of Shreveport . (aty,Buckle, Nichole) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 2/3/2021. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/13/2021. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C E O C L L C, Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture identifying Corporate Parent Eldorado Resorts Inc, Eldorado Shreveport #1 L L C, Eldorado Shreveport #2 L L C for Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture; Corporate Parent Caesars Entertainment Corp for C E O C L L C. (aty,Wolf, Scott) Modified on 12/17/2020 to add other affiliates (Jones, P). (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #8 Answer to Complaint, sent to Scott R Wolf on behalf of Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/30/2020. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jumaraca N Broadway, Eldorado Casino Shreveport Joint Venture (incorrectly named as C E O C L L C).(aty,Wolf, Scott) Modified on 12/16/2020 to edit parties (Jones, P). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. K Anderson answer due 12/11/2020; City of Shreveport answer due 12/11/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #1 to #6 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. C E O C L L C answer due 12/14/2020; Ben Raymond answer due 12/14/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in attachment #1 to #6 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by K Anderson, Ben Raymond, City of Shreveport.(aty,Buckle, Nichole) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by K Anderson, Ben Raymond, City of Shreveport . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(aty,Buckle, Nichole) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R Wolf on behalf of Jumaraca N Broadway, C E O C L L C (Attorney Scott R Wolf added to party Jumaraca N Broadway(pty:dft), Attorney Scott R Wolf added to party C E O C L L C(pty:dft)) (aty,Wolf, Scott) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/9/2020) (Jones, P). Modified on 12/9/2020 to replace in proper pdf format (Jones, P). (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/7/2020. (crt,Keller, J) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/7/2020. (crt,Rider, M) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/4/2020. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 626987-C with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4491218) filed by City of Shreveport, K Anderson, Ben Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Petition & Citation, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Nichole Marie Buckle added to party K Anderson, Ben Raymond, City of Shreveport(pty:dft))(aty,Buckle, Nichole) Modified on 12/4/2020 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEOC, LLC doing business as Caesars Entertainment is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Marshall Rice

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Fabian Kendig, Jr