Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 09:51:57 (UTC).

Sanders v. Bowen et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 Sanders filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Bowen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon E DeGuilio and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00328

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon E DeGuilio

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael A Sanders

Westville, IN 46391

Defendants

Henry

C Stobaugh

Charles Bowen

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Complaint form and send it to Michael A. Sanders and GRANTS Michael A. Sanders to and including 07/01/2019 to file an amended complaint. The Court CAUTIONS him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A because the current complaint does not state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 05/30/2019. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (jat) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

10 #3

Envelope

10 #2

USM 285 Form

10 #1

Proposed Summons

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Charles Bowen filed by Michael A Sanders. (No IFP submitted) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 USM 285 Form) (rmf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2019: #3 Envelope) (rmf). (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#9

(#9) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Michael A Sanders as to C Stobaugh. (rmc) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael A Sanders. Charles Bowen served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019; Henry served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (rmc) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) Letter from Michael Sanders forwarding summons executed/unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rmc) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael A Sanders from Westville Correctional Facility to 2205 S. Race Street, Marion, IN 46953 and requesting his over payment refund be mailed to new address. (rmc) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER DIRECTS the clerk to write this cause number on a blank Prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) and send it to Michael S. Sanders. GRANTS Michael A. Sanders until 05/29/2019, to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion accompanied by his trust fund ledgers for the past six months. CAUTIONS Michael A. Sanders that, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 4/29/2019. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(sct) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

1 #2

Letter to Clerk

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms against Charles Bowen, Henry, C Stobaugh, filed by Michael A Sanders.(No filing fee or IFP received) (Returned copy with case number to Sanders) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Letter to Clerk)(nae) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Charles Bowen filed by Michael A Sanders. (No IFP submitted) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 USM 285 Form) (rmf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2019: #3 Envelope) (rmf). (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Michael A Sanders as to C Stobaugh. (rmc) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael A Sanders. Charles Bowen served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019; Henry served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (rmc) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from Michael Sanders forwarding summons executed/unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rmc) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Complaint form and send it to Michael A. Sanders and GRANTS Michael A. Sanders to and including 07/01/2019 to file an amended complaint. The Court CAUTIONS him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A because the current complaint does not state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 05/30/2019. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (jat) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Charles Bowen, Henry, C Stobaugh. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael A Sanders from Westville Correctional Facility to 2205 S. Race Street, Marion, IN 46953 and requesting his over payment refund be mailed to new address. (rmc) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#3) Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 3022369 (rmc) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER DIRECTS the clerk to write this cause number on a blank Prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) and send it to Michael S. Sanders. GRANTS Michael A. Sanders until 05/29/2019, to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion accompanied by his trust fund ledgers for the past six months. CAUTIONS Michael A. Sanders that, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 4/29/2019. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(sct) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms against Charles Bowen, Henry, C Stobaugh, filed by Michael A Sanders.(No filing fee or IFP received) (Returned copy with case number to Sanders) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Letter to Clerk)(nae) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HENRY COMPANY LLC is a litigant