This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2022 at 07:48:32 (UTC).

Sanders et al v. The Boeing Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 Sanders filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against The Boeing Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M Hoyt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-04042

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M Hoyt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lee Marvin Sanders

Matthew Sodrok

Defendants

The Boeing Company

Kidde Technologies Inc

Jamco America Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua Paul Davis

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1010 Lamar, Ste 200

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

John Russell Hardin

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

500 N Akard St, Ste 3300

Dallas, TX 75201

Laura Hill

Attorney at Perkins Cole LLP

1201 Third Ave., Ste. 4900

Seattle, WA 98101

Geffrey W Anderson

Attorney at Anderson & Riddle, LLP

1604 8Th Avenue

Fort Worth, TX 76104

Alex Joseph Whitman

Attorney at Cunningham Swaim, LLP

4015 Main Street, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75226

Don Swaim

Attorney at Cunningham Swaim, LLP

4015 Main Street, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75226

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions by Lee Marvin Sanders, Matthew Sodrok, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/28/2022. (Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

18 #2

Proposed Order

18 #1

Appendix

18 #18

Main Document

17 #2

Proposed Order

17 #1

Appendix

17 #17

Main Document

16 #1

Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) APPENDIX re: #14 MOTION for Judgment by Jamco America Inc., filed.(Swaim, Don) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Judgment by Jamco America Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2022. (Swaim, Don) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jamco America Inc. identifying Jamco Corporation (Japan) as Corporate Parent, filed.(Swaim, Don) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Jamco America Inc., filed.(Swaim, Don) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit A-5 List of Counsel of Record

1 #4

Exhibit A-3 Request for Issuance of Citation

1 #3

Exhibit A-2 - Letter from TXSOS

1 #2

Exhibit A-1 Plaintiffs' Original Petition

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions by Lee Marvin Sanders, Matthew Sodrok, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/28/2022. (Davis, Joshua) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(B)(2) and Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6) For Failure to state a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted and Brief in Support( by Kidde Technologies Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Geffrey) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint as Untimely Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support by The Boeing Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Hardin, John) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs Original Petition by Kidde Technologies Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Geffrey) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPENDIX re: #14 MOTION for Judgment by Jamco America Inc., filed.(Swaim, Don) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Judgment by Jamco America Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2022. (Swaim, Don) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jamco America Inc. identifying Jamco Corporation (Japan) as Corporate Parent, filed.(Swaim, Don) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Jamco America Inc., filed.(Swaim, Don) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Daniel P. Ridlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Boeing Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/15/2022. (Hardin, John) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Laura Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Laura Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Boeing Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/10/2022. (Hardin, John) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by The Boeing Company, filed.(Hardin, John) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alex J. Whitman on behalf of Jamco America Inc., filed. (Whitman, Alex) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by The Boeing Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Set Deadline for Filing Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Hardin, John) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT to Removal by Kidde Technologies Inc, filed.(Anderson, Geffrey) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Jamco America Inc., filed. (Swaim, Don) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of John Hardin re: #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Envelope Exhibit C)(Hardin, John) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Boeing Company, filed.(Hardin, John) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 198th Harris County District Court, case number 202174036 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27461888) filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Index of Documents Being Filed, #2 Exhibit A-1 Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Letter from TXSOS, #4 Exhibit A-3 Request for Issuance of Citation, #5 Exhibit A-4 Harris County Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit A-5 List of Counsel of Record, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, John) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura Hill

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Geffrey W Anderson(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Don Swaim

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Russell Hardin