This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2020 at 08:32:26 (UTC).

Sanders et al v. Hyundai Motor America et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Sanders filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Hyundai Motor America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gloria M. Navarro and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01861

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Valerie Sanders

Marsallis Sanders

M. S.

Defendants

ZF TRW Friedrichshafen AG

ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.

Takata Corporation

Hyundai Motor Company

Hyundai Motor America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H. Stan Johnson

Attorney at COHEN-JOHNSON, LLC

375 E. Warm Springs Road, Suite 104

Las Vegas, NV 89119

J. Randall Jones

Attorney at Kemp, Jones & Coulthard, LLP

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, 17Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Eric Pepperman

Attorney at Kemp, Jones & Coulthard, LLP

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Joshua D Carlson

Attorney at Kemp Jones LLP

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, 17Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89169

James L Edwards

Attorney at Cohen Johnson Parker Edwards

375 E Warm Springs Rd., #104

Las Vegas, NV 89074

Defendant Attorneys

Michael E Stoberski

Attorney at Olson, Cannon, Gormley, Angulo & Stoberski

9950 West Cheyenne Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89129

David R. Tippetts

Attorney at Weinstein Tippetts & Little LLP

7660 Woodway

Houston, TX 77063

Thad K. Jenks

Attorney at Weinstein Tippetts & Little LLP

7500 San Felipe, Suite 500

Houston, TX 77063

Paul G. Cereghini

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

2901 N Central Ave Ste 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Jeffrey Carl Warren

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke

2901 N. Central Ave., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Charles M. Seby

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

2901 N. Central Avenue, Suite 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Mario D Valencia

Attorney at Mario D. Valencia, Attorney at Law, LLC

40 S. Stephanie St., Suite 201

Henderson, NV 89012

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order STIPULATION re Discovery by Plaintiffs M. S., Valerie Sanders. (Jones, J.) Modified event from a stipulation to discover plan and scheduling order on 12/1/2020 (DKJ). (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#32

(#32) ORDER Granting #31 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#31

(#31) STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and Order of Dismissal for ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. by Plaintiffs M. S., Valerie Sanders. (Jones, J.) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#30

(#30) ORDER Granting #29 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey Warren for Hyundai Motor America and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mario D Valencia. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/6/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#29

(#29) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey C. Warren and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mario D. Valencia (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6246626) by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Valencia, Mario) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#28

(#28) Joint STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs M. S., Valerie Sanders. (Jones, J.) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#27

(#27) ORDER Granting #26 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #17 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/17/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#26

(#26) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #17 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs M. S., Valerie Sanders. (Jones, J.) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

17 #3

Exhibit Mills Order

17 #2

Exhibit Declaration of Guy Simons

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Cereghini, Paul) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit A-J

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J) (Cereghini, Paul) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/6/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/21/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#2

(#9) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Cereghini, Paul) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit A-J

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#8) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J) (Cereghini, Paul) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order STIPULATION re Discovery by Plaintiffs M. S., Valerie Sanders. (Jones, J.) Modified event from a stipulation to discover plan and scheduling order on 12/1/2020 (DKJ). (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER Granting #31 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation and Order of Dismissal for ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. by Plaintiffs M. S., Valerie Sanders. (Jones, J.) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER Granting #29 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey Warren for Hyundai Motor America and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mario D Valencia. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/6/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey C. Warren and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mario D. Valencia (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6246626) by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Valencia, Mario) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Joint STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs M. S., Valerie Sanders. (Jones, J.) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER Granting #26 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #17 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/17/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #17 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs M. S., Valerie Sanders. (Jones, J.) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER Granting #24 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #17 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/3/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #17 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs M. S., Valerie Sanders. (Jones, J.) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Cereghini, Paul) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J) (Cereghini, Paul) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Docket Correction to 6 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP, : Notice entered in error by clerks office. Document terminated. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket(#6) Entered in error by clerk. Document terminated. NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Paul G. Cereghini to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. (no image attached) (JQC) Modified on 10/6/2020 (DKJ). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/6/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/21/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE: Violation of the Local Rules and Filer Action required. - ERROR: Document #1 and #2 were not filed pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1 by Attorney Paul Cereghini. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a redacted copy for the public record pursuant to LR IC 6-1. Document #1 and #2 restricted in accordance with FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 6-1. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) VIEW #9 corrected image re CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hyundai Motor America. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cereghini, Paul) Modified on 10/6/2020 (DKJ). (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VIEW #8 corrected image re PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-815255-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6200240) by Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-J) (Cereghini, Paul) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 10/6/2020 (DKJ). (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where TAKATA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thad Kingston Jenks