This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 07:19:22 (UTC).

SANDERS v. COOK INCORPORATED, et al.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 SANDERS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt, Doris L. Pryor, Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02895

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Tanya Walton Pratt

Richard L. Young

Referral Judges

Doris L. Pryor

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARK SANDERS

Defendants

COOK MEDICAL LLC

COOK INCORPORATED

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

A. Craig Eiland

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF A. CRAIG EILAND PC

2200 Market Streetsuite 501

Galveston, TX 77550

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Streetsuite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Streetsuite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by MARK SANDERS. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-6853165) (Eiland, A.) Modified on 11/23/2021 (party selection) (DJH). Modified on 12/6/2021 to put correct receipt number. (NLR). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#11

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MED INSTITUTE INC., MED INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02895-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02964-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06630-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06668-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06674-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06677-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06678-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06679-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06682-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06684-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06687-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06688-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06689-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06695-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#12

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MED INSTITUTE INC., MED INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02895-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02964-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06630-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06668-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06674-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06677-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06678-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06679-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06682-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06684-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06687-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06688-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06689-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06695-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Tanya Walton Pratt and Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-2895-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff MARK SANDERS. (Eiland, A.) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by A. Craig Eiland on behalf of Plaintiff MARK SANDERS. (Eiland, A.) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically , filed by Plaintiff MARK SANDERS. (Eiland, A.) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#7

(#7) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/6/2021.(LBT) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting (6) Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically in case 1:21-cv-02895-RLY-TAB. The Clerk is instructed to issue a refund of $804 to the credit card used in this transaction (Tracking ID Nos. AINSDC-6853199 and AINSDC-6853304). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/6/2021. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02895-RLY-TAB(LBT) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MED INSTITUTE INC., MED INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02895-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02964-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06630-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06668-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06674-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06677-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06678-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06679-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06682-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06684-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06687-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06688-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06689-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06695-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK GROUP INC., COOK MED INSTITUTE INC., MED INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, MEDICAL ENGINEERING AND DEVELOPMENT INSTITUTE, INC., COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES, COOK DENMARK INTERNATIONAL APS, COOK DENMARK HOLDING APS, COOK GROUP EUROPE APS, COOK NEDERLAND BV, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02895-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02964-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06630-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06668-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06674-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06677-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06678-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06679-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06682-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06684-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06687-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06688-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06689-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06695-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting (6) Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically in case 1:21-cv-02895-RLY-TAB. The Clerk is instructed to issue a refund of $804 to the credit card used in this transaction (Tracking ID Nos. AINSDC-6853199 and AINSDC-6853304). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/6/2021. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02895-RLY-TAB(LBT) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docket(#8) Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN 1:21-cv-02895-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02907-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02909-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02912-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02915-RLY-TAB Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 12/6/2021. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02895-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02907-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02909-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02912-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-02915-RLY-TAB (LBT) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/6/2021.(LBT) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically , filed by Plaintiff MARK SANDERS. (Eiland, A.) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by A. Craig Eiland on behalf of Plaintiff MARK SANDERS. (Eiland, A.) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff MARK SANDERS. (Eiland, A.) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Tanya Walton Pratt and Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor are no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-2895-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by MARK SANDERS. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-6853165) (Eiland, A.) Modified on 11/23/2021 (party selection) (DJH). Modified on 12/6/2021 to put correct receipt number. (NLR). (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK MEDICAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK INCORPORATED is a litigant