This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2022 at 06:15:18 (UTC).

Sandeep Roy Chauhan v. Google Inc.

Case Summary

On November 17, 2021, Sandeep Roy Chauhan (“Plaintiff”) self-represented, filed a civil rights lawsuit against Google Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking declaratory relief, for ascertaining the legal right to obtain the content of communications and other files stored in Decedent's Account. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Central District of California with Judges George H. Wu and Margo A. Rocconi presiding. 

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “Plaintiff's father had created a Google account of username Mysandeepchauhan@gmail.com to receive e-mail and store files in the drive. Plaintiff's father has been deceased on February 23, 2021. Plaintiff requested Google to download data from this user account. Google asked for various documents for verification.” 

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that “Plaintiff requested the defendant to allow download e-mails from decedent's user account. Defendant accepted the plaintiff's request. The defendant performed a preliminary review of plaintiff's statement and attributes and documents. Defendant found everything correct. After preliminary review defendant demanded a court order generated in court to state facts.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged, “Defendant replied that to proceed further with your request we need a U.S court order directed to Google inc. to specified following facts: (a) That the decedent is deceased; (b) That the decedent is the sole account holder of the named account; (c) That the requesting party has a legal right to obtain the content; (d) The specific Gmail content being requested; (e) That disclosure of the content would not violate any applicable laws, including but not limited to the Electronic Communications Privacy Act and any state equivalent; (f) That Google Inc. is ordered to produce the requested Gmail content; (g) The location to which product needs to be sent; (h) That the requesting party must attach the order to an email sent to postmortemrequests@google.com e-mail address.”

 

The Plaintiff lists out two claims for relief. The first claim is for alleged violations of the Stored Communication Act (SCA), wherein the Plaintiff alleged that Plaintiff is the legal administrator and heir of the deceased person. Plaintiff has all the supporting documents and evidence to prove the facts. Plaintiff has not violated the Stored Communication Act (SCA), during obtaining of decedent user account data. The second claim is for alleged violations of the Electronic Communication Privacy Act, wherein the Plaintiff claimed that Defendant has not violated the Electronic Communication Privacy Act during disclosing user contents stored in Decedent's account to administration's e-mail address neerajxchauhan@gmail.com.

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court to produce an order directed to Google Inc. specifying that Bhagat Singh is deceased, that Sandeep Roy Chauhan is the lawful administrator of Decedent's estate under law, that Decedent is the solo account holder of the Google Account(s) registered under the email address(es) mysandeepchauhan@gmail.com, that Administrator has a legal right to obtain the content of communications and other files stored in Decedent's Account, that there is sufficient consent pursuant to the Stored Communication Act and Electronic Communication Privacy Act. Further, under the circumstances of this case, and light of this Order, no legal duty, or obligation, including, but not limited to, any provision of the federal Stored Communications Act, prohibits Google from disclosing to Administration the content stored in Decedent's Account. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09054

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judges

Jacqueline Chooljian

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandeep Roy Chauhan

Palwal, HA 121102

Defendant

Google Inc.

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

CV-71

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Google Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sandeep Roy Chauhan. (ghap) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (ghap) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09054 GW(JCx). (rn) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#8

(#8) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: INTER-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the action - and the Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ECF 2) as to which this Court has taken no action - is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (see document for further details). Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge George H. Wu, ORDERING Notice of Dismissal submitted by Plaintiff Sandeep Roy Chauhan received on 12/23/21 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Case dosed on November 23, 2021. Transferred to USDC Northern District of California. (lom) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge George H. Wu, ORDERING Notice of Dismissal submitted by Plaintiff Sandeep Roy Chauhan received on 12/23/21 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Case dosed on November 23, 2021. Transferred to USDC Northern District of California. (lom) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#9) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Northern District, 5:21-cv-09201 filed 11/29/2021. (iv) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: INTER-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the action - and the Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ECF 2) as to which this Court has taken no action - is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (see document for further details). Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09054 GW(JCx). (rn) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (ghap) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sandeep Roy Chauhan. (ghap) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Google Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendant Google Inc. Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi, filed by plaintiff Sandeep Roy Chauhan. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2021: #2 Summons) (ghap). Modified on 11/18/2021 (ghap). (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant