This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 17:19:49 (UTC).

Sanchez v. Standard Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Sanchez filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Standard Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. Steele and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00417

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E. Steele

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandra Sanchez

Defendant

Standard Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Philip Dabdoub

Attorney at Dabdoub Law Firm, PA

1600 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 1202

Coral Gables, FL 33134-4096

Defendant Attorneys

Tucker Motta

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

2385 N.W. Executive Center Drive, Suite 400

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Wendy L. Furman

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

2385 Executive Center Dr Ste 400

Boca Raton, FL 33431

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER requiring the parties to meet either in-person or by telephone to agree to a case management schedule in this case no later than 8/13/2021. Additionally, the parties must file a Case Management Report that complies with this Order no later than 8/30/2021. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/14/2021. (WJF) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Standard Insurance Company.(Furman, Wendy) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Sandra Sanchez. Related case(s): No (Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Civil Disclosure Order by Sandra Sanchez. (Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Standard Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Motta, Tucker) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Civil Action Order by Standard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent StanCorp Financial Group, Inc., for Standard Insurance Company. (Furman, Wendy) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Standard Insurance Company. (Furman, Wendy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 06/21/2021)

5 #1

Affidavit

#5

(#5) RETURN of service executed on 06/03/2021 by Sandra Sanchez as to Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/27/2021. (MLS) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Standard Insurance Company. (MLS) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against Standard Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18298455) filed by Sandra Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER requiring the parties to meet either in-person or by telephone to agree to a case management schedule in this case no later than 8/13/2021. Additionally, the parties must file a Case Management Report that complies with this Order no later than 8/30/2021. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/14/2021. (WJF) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Standard Insurance Company.(Furman, Wendy) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Defendant Standard's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1), no later than 7/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/21/2021. (WJF) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Sandra Sanchez. Related case(s): No (Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Civil Disclosure Order by Sandra Sanchez. (Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Standard Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Motta, Tucker) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Civil Action Order by Standard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent StanCorp Financial Group, Inc., for Standard Insurance Company. (Furman, Wendy) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Standard Insurance Company. (Furman, Wendy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of service executed on 06/03/2021 by Sandra Sanchez as to Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/27/2021. (MLS) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Standard Insurance Company. (MLS) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0417-JES-MRM. (SJB) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against Standard Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18298455) filed by Sandra Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Standard Insurance Co. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tucker C. Motta

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wendy Lynn Furman