This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2020 at 10:16:05 (UTC).

Sanchez v. S&P Data New Mexico, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Sanchez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against P Data New Mexico, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Fouratt and Jerry H. Ritter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00979

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Fouratt

Presiding Judge

Jerry H. Ritter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Sanchez

Defendants

S&P Data, LLC

S&P Data New Mexico, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Don Foty

Attorney at Hodges & Foty, LLP

4409 Montrose Blvd., Suite 200

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Robert Simmons

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Jacqueline M Woodcock

Attorney at Conklin Woodcock & Ziegler PC

320 Gold Ave Sw, Suite 800

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Christine M Snyder

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

John K Ziegler

Attorney at Conklin, Woodcock & Ziegler, PC

320 Gold Ave Sw, Suite 1111

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 1/19/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 1/12/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/1/2020. (nmh) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by S&P Data New Mexico, LLC, S&P Data, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Juan Sanchez.(Ziegler, John) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by S&P Data New Mexico, LLC (Ziegler, John) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by S&P Data, LLC (Ziegler, John) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by S&P Data New Mexico, LLC, S&P Data, LLC Notice of Good Standing for Thomas R. Simmons and Christine M. Snyder (Ziegler, John) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by S&P Data New Mexico, LLC, S&P Data, LLC Notice of Extension (Ziegler, John) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John K Ziegler on behalf of All Defendants (Ziegler, John) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Sanchez. S&P Data, LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Foty, Don) Modified on 10/13/2020 (arp). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Sanchez. S&P Data New Mexico, LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Foty, Don) Modified on 10/13/2020 (arp). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#4

(#4) **FILED IN ERROR**SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Sanchez. S&P Data New Mexico, LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; S&P Data, LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Foty, Don) Modified on 10/9/2020 (dr). (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Juan Sanchez of filing Certificate of Interested Parties (Foty, Don) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by S&P Data New Mexico, LLC, S&P Data, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Juan Sanchez.(Ziegler, John) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 1/19/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 1/12/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/1/2020. (nmh) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by S&P Data New Mexico, LLC, S&P Data, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Juan Sanchez.(Ziegler, John) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by S&P Data New Mexico, LLC (Ziegler, John) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by S&P Data, LLC (Ziegler, John) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#12) Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # ANMDC-7368768 re: 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant S&P Data, LLC, Defendant S&P Data New Mexico, LLC (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAssociation Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7369133 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by S&P Data, LLC, S&P Data New Mexico, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Snyder, Christine) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by S&P Data New Mexico, LLC, S&P Data, LLC Notice of Good Standing for Thomas R. Simmons and Christine M. Snyder (Ziegler, John) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#10) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants S&P Data New Mexico, LLC, S&P Data, LLC by John K Ziegler on behalf of: Christine Michelle Snyder Tucker Ellis LLP 950 Main Avenue Suite 1100Cleveland, Ohio 44113 216-696-5593 Fax 216-592-5009 christine.snyder@tuckerellis.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Ziegler, John)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#9) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants S&P Data New Mexico, LLC, S&P Data, LLC by John K Ziegler on behalf of: Thomas Robert Simmons Tucker Ellis LLP 950 Main Avenue Suite 1100Cleveland, Ohio 44113 216-696-3807 Fax 216-592-5009 thomas.simmons@tuckerellis.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Ziegler, John)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by S&P Data New Mexico, LLC, S&P Data, LLC Notice of Extension (Ziegler, John) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John K Ziegler on behalf of All Defendants (Ziegler, John) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Sanchez. S&P Data, LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Foty, Don) Modified on 10/13/2020 (arp). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Sanchez. S&P Data New Mexico, LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Foty, Don) Modified on 10/13/2020 (arp). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **FILED IN ERROR**SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Sanchez. S&P Data New Mexico, LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; S&P Data, LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Foty, Don) Modified on 10/9/2020 (dr). (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to All Defendants. (dr) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7324906 re #1 Complaint filed by Juan Sanchez (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Foty, Don) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Juan Sanchez of filing Certificate of Interested Parties (Foty, Don) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (dr) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against S&P Data New Mexico, LLC, S&P Data, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Juan Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Foty, Don) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Don Foty