This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2021 at 08:00:01 (UTC).

Sanchez v. Renown South Meadows Medical Center

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 Sanchez filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Renown South Meadows Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Miranda M. Du and William G. Cobb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00352

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Miranda M. Du

Referral Judge

William G. Cobb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lucero Sanchez

Defendants

Renown South Meadows Medical Center

Renown Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arthur Julius Bayer, Jr

18124 Wedge Pkwy #404

Reno, NV 89511

Luke Andrew Busby

Attorney at Luke Andrew Busby, Ltd.

316 California Ave 82

Reno, NV 89509

Defendant Attorney

Sandra Ketner

Attorney at Simons Hall Johnston PC

6490 S. Mccarran Blvd, Suite F-46

Reno, NV 89509

 

Court Documents

#7

#6

5 #6

Summons

5 #5

Exhibit

5 #4

Exhibit

5 #3

Exhibit

5 #2

Exhibit

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

#4

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lucero Sanchez re #6 Summons Issued. Renown Health waiver sent on 8/14/2021, answer due 10/13/2021. (Busby, Luke) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Renown Health re ECF No. #5 Amended complaint. (DRM) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Renown Health by Lucero Sanchez. Removes parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Summons) (Busby, Luke) (Entered: 08/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Renown South Meadows Medical Center, re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (KR) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for ENE. (WJ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lucero Sanchez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Busby, Luke) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Renown South Meadows Medical Center (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6593308) by Lucero Sanchez. Proof of service due by 11/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons) (Busby, Luke) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RENOWN HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sandra Ketner