This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2021 at 09:50:06 (UTC).

Sanchez v. Money Metals Exchange LLC

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Sanchez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Money Metals Exchange LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alison J. Nathan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01813

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alison J. Nathan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cristian Sanchez

Defendant

Money Metals Exchange LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph H Mizrahi

Defendant Attorney

Andrew C Karter

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that the parties have reached a settlement agreement, Dkt. No. 7, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within thirty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. IT IS ORDERED that all scheduled conferences are hereby adjourned sine die. Within the thirty-day period provided for in this Order, the parties may submit to the Court their own Stipulation of Dismissal for the Court to So Order. Pursuant to Rule 5.A. of the Court's Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless the terms of the agreement are made part of the public record. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/12/2021) (nb) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Andrew C. Karter dated April 2, 2021. Document filed by Money Metals Exchange LLC. So ordered. Money Metals Exchange LLC answer due 5/5/2021. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/2/2021) (rjm) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#6

(#6) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Andrew C. Karter dated April 2, 2021. Document filed by Money Metals Exchange LLC..(Karter, Andrew) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew C Karter on behalf of Money Metals Exchange LLC..(Karter, Andrew) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Money Metals Exchange LLC..(jgo) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Money Metals Exchange LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Money Metals Exchange LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24156512)Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

04/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that the parties have reached a settlement agreement, Dkt. No. 7, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within thirty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. IT IS ORDERED that all scheduled conferences are hereby adjourned sine die. Within the thirty-day period provided for in this Order, the parties may submit to the Court their own Stipulation of Dismissal for the Court to So Order. Pursuant to Rule 5.A. of the Court's Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless the terms of the agreement are made part of the public record. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/12/2021) (nb) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Andrew C. Karter dated April 2, 2021. Document filed by Money Metals Exchange LLC. So ordered. Money Metals Exchange LLC answer due 5/5/2021. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/2/2021) (rjm) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Andrew C. Karter dated April 2, 2021. Document filed by Money Metals Exchange LLC..(Karter, Andrew) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew C Karter on behalf of Money Metals Exchange LLC..(Karter, Andrew) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Money Metals Exchange LLC..(jgo) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2021

DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2021

DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2021

DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Money Metals Exchange LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Money Metals Exchange LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24156512)Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less