This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2021 at 07:36:06 (UTC).

Sanchez v. Koch Industries, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Sanchez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Koch Industries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00959

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christian Sanchez

Defendant

Koch Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph H Mizrahi

Attorney at Cohen & Mizrahi LLP

300 Cadman Plaza West, 12Th Floor

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Defendant Attorney

Alexandra Manfredi

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT #9 Notice of Settlement. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' request is granted. All deadlines in this action are stayed. If this action is not voluntarily dismissed by May 3, 2021, the parties are directed to file a status letter with the Court describing the status of settlement discussions. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/2/2021) (js) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Christian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Koch Industries, Inc. served on 2/15/2021, answer due 4/7/2021. Service was accepted by Denise Rookstool, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by Christian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Alexandra C. Manfredi dated February 24, 2021. Document filed by Koch Industries, Inc. Defendant's request is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by April 7, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Koch Industries, Inc. answer due 4/7/2021). (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 2/24/2021) (rjm) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Alexandra C. Manfredi dated February 24, 2021. Document filed by Koch Industries, Inc...(Manfredi, Alexandra) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandra Manfredi on behalf of Koch Industries, Inc...(Manfredi, Alexandra) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Koch Industries, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Koch Industries, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Koch Industries, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23806985)Document filed by Christian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Koch Industries, Inc., as successor in interest to Koch Investment (UK) Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexandra C. Manfredi