This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:49:02 (UTC).

SANCHEZ v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability case was filed by SANCHEZ against JOHNSON JOHNSON in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17145

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEBBIE SANCHEZ

Defendants

MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC

ETHICON INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Letter re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting leave to appear Pro Hac Vice as to Dustin B. Rawlin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/02/2019. (jmh) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#10

(#10) Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Debbie Sanchez. (YOUNG, DENA) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

9 #3

Certificate of Service

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Certification of Dustin B. Rawlin, Esq.

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ETHICON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Dustin B. Rawlin, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of ETHICON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

7 #8

Certificate of Service

7 #7

Text of Proposed Order

7 #6

Exhibit D to Certification of Michael C. Zogby

7 #5

Exhibit C to Certification of Michael C. Zogby

7 #4

Exhibit B to Certification of Michael C. Zogby

7 #3

Exhibit A to Certification of Michael C. Zogby

7 #2

Certification of Michael C. Zogby, Esq.

7 #1

Brief

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by ETHICON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Michael C. Zogby, Esq., #3 Exhibit A to Certification of Michael C. Zogby, #4 Exhibit B to Certification of Michael C. Zogby, #5 Exhibit C to Certification of Michael C. Zogby, #6 Exhibit D to Certification of Michael C. Zogby, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Letter re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting leave to appear Pro Hac Vice as to Dustin B. Rawlin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/02/2019. (jmh) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Debbie Sanchez. (YOUNG, DENA) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ETHICON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Dustin B. Rawlin, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of ETHICON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by ETHICON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Michael C. Zogby, Esq., #3 Exhibit A to Certification of Michael C. Zogby, #4 Exhibit B to Certification of Michael C. Zogby, #5 Exhibit C to Certification of Michael C. Zogby, #6 Exhibit D to Certification of Michael C. Zogby, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint Against Johnson & Johnson served on Kathleen Leshik on 9/09/19, filed by DEBBIE SANCHEZ. (MCCORMICK, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint Against Ethicon, Inc. served on Kathleen Leshik on 9/09/19, filed by DEBBIE SANCHEZ. (MCCORMICK, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint on Mentor Worldwide, LLC served on Daisy Montenegro on 08/27/2019, filed by DEBBIE SANCHEZ. (MCCORMICK, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ETHICON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by DENA RACHEL YOUNG on behalf of DEBBIE SANCHEZ (YOUNG, DENA) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ETHICON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MENTOR WORLDWIDE LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916113) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DEBBIE SANCHEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCCORMICK, BRIAN) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.