This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/26/2021 at 10:36:34 (UTC).

Sanchez v. GP Transportation Co. et al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 Sanchez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GP Transportation Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John Preston Bailey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00130

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Preston Bailey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Sanchez

Defendants

Schneider Logistics, Inc.

GP Transportation Co. doing business as GP Transco

Cintas Corporation

Schneider International

Kokosing Construction Company, Inc.

The Olen Corporation

CG Enterprises, Inc.

McGraw/Kokosing, Inc.

Kokosing Materials, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Buckner

Attorney at Katz Kantor Stonestreet & Buckner, PLLC

207 South Walker Street

Princeton, WV 24740

Defendant Attorneys

Julie A. Brennan

Attorney at Pion, Nerone, Girman, Winslow & Smith, PC

1500 One Gateway Center, 420 Fort Duquesne Blvd.

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Timothy A. Montgomery

Attorney at Pion, Nerone, Girman, Winslow & Smith, PC

1500 One Gateway Center, 420 Fort Duquesne Blvd.

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/19/2021; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/2/2021; Initial Disclosures due by 11/16/2021. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/21/2021. (ag) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by GP Transportation Co..(Montgomery, Timothy) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jennifer Sanchez. Schneider Logistics, Inc. waiver sent on 8/30/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Buckner, Eric) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jennifer Sanchez. Cintas Corporation waiver sent on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Buckner, Eric) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jennifer Sanchez. GP Transportation Co. waiver sent on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Buckner, Eric) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jennifer Sanchez. Filing Fee $402. Receipt #AWVNDC-3303791. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ag) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kokosing Construction Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHNEIDER LOGISTICS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CINTAS CORPORATION NO 2 DBA CINTAS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julie A. Brennan