This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2021 at 09:13:31 (UTC).

SANCHEZ v. EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 SANCHEZ filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Beth Bloom and Alicia O. Valle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-62657

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

Referral Judge

Alicia O. Valle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTIN E. SANCHEZ

Defendants

MITCH AMSTERDAM

EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zandro E. Palma

Attorney at Zandro E. Palma, P.A.

9100 South Dadeland Boulevard, Suite 1500

Miami, FL 33156

Defendant Attorney

Steven Adam Siegel

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips

450 E Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRINGMEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/19/2021., Discovery due by 10/19/2021., Fact Discovery due by 10/19/2021., Expert Discovery due by 10/19/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 4/19/2021., Mediation Deadline 11/2/2021., In Limine Motions due by 11/10/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 11/10/2021., Motions due by 11/10/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/31/2022., Jury Trial set for 2/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 2/8/2022 at 01:45 PM before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 11/2/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by MITCH AMSTERDAM, EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC. (Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by MITCH AMSTERDAM, EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC (Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#7

(#7) Statement of: Claim by MARTIN E. SANCHEZ re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MARTIN E. SANCHEZ. EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTEDPARTIES,1 AND STATEMENT OF CLAIM AND RESPONSE IN FLSA CASE. Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for purposes of a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to MITCH AMSTERDAM, EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC. (mee) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MITCH AMSTERDAM, EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-14091499, payment transferred from 0:20-cv-62653; MARTIN E. SANCHEZ v. EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC et al., filed by MARTIN E. SANCHEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Palma, Zandro) Modified text on 1/7/2021 to reflect transferred case number (bb). (Entered: 12/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRINGMEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/19/2021., Discovery due by 10/19/2021., Fact Discovery due by 10/19/2021., Expert Discovery due by 10/19/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 4/19/2021., Mediation Deadline 11/2/2021., In Limine Motions due by 11/10/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 11/10/2021., Motions due by 11/10/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/31/2022., Jury Trial set for 2/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 2/8/2022 at 01:45 PM before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 11/2/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by MITCH AMSTERDAM, EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC. (Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by MITCH AMSTERDAM, EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC (Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of: Claim by MARTIN E. SANCHEZ re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MARTIN E. SANCHEZ. EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC served on 1/6/2021, answer due 1/27/2021. (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTEDPARTIES,1 AND STATEMENT OF CLAIM AND RESPONSE IN FLSA CASE. Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for purposes of a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to MITCH AMSTERDAM, EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC. (mee) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MITCH AMSTERDAM, EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-14091499, payment transferred from 0:20-cv-62653; MARTIN E. SANCHEZ v. EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC et al., filed by MARTIN E. SANCHEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Palma, Zandro) Modified text on 1/7/2021 to reflect transferred case number (bb). (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVENT EFFECTS GROUP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zandro E. Palma