This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2021 at 07:32:47 (UTC).

Sanchez v. Discovery Communications, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Sanchez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Discovery Communications, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Kay Vyskocil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00935

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Kay Vyskocil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christian Sanchez

Defendant

Discovery Communications, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph H Mizrahi

Attorney at Cohen & Mizrahi LLP

300 Cadman Plaza West, 12Th Floor

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Defendant Attorney

Gary Drew Friedman

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP (NYC)

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 4/21/2021. Motions due by 5/21/2021. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/23/2021) (jca) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Gary Friedman dated March 22, 2021. Document filed by Discovery Communications, LLC..(Friedman, Gary) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. Discovery Communications, LLC answer due 4/5/2021. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 3/1/2021) (mro) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Discovery, Inc. for Discovery Communications, LLC. Document filed by Discovery Communications, LLC..(Friedman, Gary) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Drew Friedman on behalf of Discovery Communications, LLC..(Friedman, Gary) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Gary D. Friedman dated March 1, 2021. Document filed by Discovery Communications, LLC..(Friedman, Gary) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Discovery Communications, LLC served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. Service was accepted by Patrick Duffy, Agent. Document filed by Christian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Discovery Communications, LLC..(jgo) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Discovery Communications, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Discovery Communications, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23802197)Document filed by Christian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVERY COMMUNICATIONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph H Mizrahi