This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2019 at 07:51:28 (UTC).

Sanchez v. Biomet Orthopedics LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 Sanchez filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Biomet Orthopedics LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Staci G Cornelius and R David Proctor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01578

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Staci G Cornelius

R David Proctor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oscar Sanchez

Defendants

Biomet Orthopedics LLC

Biomet Manufacturing Corp

Biomet US Reconstruction LLC

Biomet Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel C Burke PHV

Attorney at Bernstein Liebhard LLP

10 E 40Th St 22Nd Fl

New York, NY 10016

Daniel C Burke

Attorney at BERNSTEIN LIEBHARD LLP

10 East 40Th Street

New York, NY 10016

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie N Russo

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP - Ind/IN/300/2700

300 N Meridian St Ste 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1782

Adrienne Franco Busby

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP - Ind/IN/300/2700

300 N Meridian St Ste 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1782

John D LaDue

Attorney at LaDue Curran & Kuehn LLC

100 E Wayne St Ste 300

South Bend, IN 46601

Erin Linder Hanig

Attorney at LaDue Curran & Kuehn LLC

100 E Wayne St Ste 300

South Bend, IN 46601

Andrew L Campbell

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP - Ind/IN/300/2700

300 N Meridian St Ste 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1782

J Joseph Tanner

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP - Ind/IN/300/2700

300 N Meridian St Ste 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1782

Matthew Thomas Albaugh

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Xan Peyton Ingram

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

1819 5Th Avenue North, Ste. 1000

Birmingham, AL 35203

Emily T Dodane

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Alan D Mathis

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

One Federal Place, 1819 5Th Avenue North Suite 1000

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:19-cv-1578-RDP on all subsequent pleadings. (KEK) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Status Conference held on 10/8/2019 ; attys Daniel Burke, Emily Dodane and Alan Mathis present by telephone; conf adj. (chambers) (MSN) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) ORDER- Pursuant to the General Order for Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than October 22, 2019; In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after October 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/8/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) TEXT ORDER: The motions seeking leave for Matthew T. Albaugh and Emily T. Dodane to appear pro hac vice on behalf of the defendants (Docs. #72 , #74 ) are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/8/19. (MRR, ) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC. filed by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC (Mathis, Alan) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) NOTICE by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC of Declaration of Emily T. Dodane in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Mathis, Alan)-Document signed by Emily T Dodane only- Modified on 10/8/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3451357 (B4601101159). (Mathis, Alan) Modified on 10/9/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Emily T. Dodane Motion is RIPE 10/7/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC. (Mathis, Alan) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) NOTICE by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC of Declaration of Matthew T. Albaugh in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Mathis, Alan)-Document signed by Matthew T Albaugh only- Modified on 10/8/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3451351 (B4601101158). (Mathis, Alan) Modified on 10/9/2019 (MRR, ). (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE : Call-in information for the August 24, 2017 status conference at 1:00 pm (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/18/2017. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/23/2019.] (Entered: 08/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JULY 13, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE , Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Parties to submit recommendations regarding procedures for handling new referrals and culminating proceedings by August 17, 2017. Next status conference set for August 24, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/14/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/23/2019.] (Entered: 07/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC (LaDue, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/23/2019.] (Entered: 07/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/23/2019.] (Entered: 07/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the July 13, 2017 status conference at 9:30 am (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/10/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/23/2019.] (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/23/2019.] (Entered: 07/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/23/2019.] (Entered: 07/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Oscar Sanchez (Burke PHV, Daniel) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/23/2019.] (Entered: 07/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons filed by Oscar Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Burke PHV, Daniel) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/23/2019.] (Entered: 07/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3294073.), filed by Oscar Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke PHV, Daniel) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/23/2019.] (Entered: 07/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIOMET MANUFACTURING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS LLC is a litigant