This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/24/2021 at 08:22:19 (UTC).

Sanchez v. Barkman Honey, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 Sanchez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Barkman Honey, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul G. Gardephe and Ona T. Wang. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02593

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Gardephe

Referral Judge

Ona T. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cristian Sanchez

Defendant

Barkman Honey, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph H Mizrahi

Attorney at Cohen & Mizrahi LLP

300 Cadman Plaza West, 12Th Floor

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be, and hereby is, dismissed with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that if the settlement is not consummated within thirty days of this order, either party may apply by letter within the thirty-day period for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Any pending dates and deadlines are adjourned sine die, and any pending motions are moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/14/2021) (ks) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#6

(#6) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held telephonically on Tuesday, June 08, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. The dial in information is (866) 3901828, access code 1582687. Initial Conference set for 6/8/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 3/31/2021) (nb) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/27/2021) (js) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barkman Honey, LLC..(pc) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barkman Honey, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Barkman Honey, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24308242)Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be, and hereby is, dismissed with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that if the settlement is not consummated within thirty days of this order, either party may apply by letter within the thirty-day period for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned, in which event the action will be restored. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Any pending dates and deadlines are adjourned sine die, and any pending motions are moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/14/2021) (ks) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held telephonically on Tuesday, June 08, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. The dial in information is (866) 3901828, access code 1582687. Initial Conference set for 6/8/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 3/31/2021) (nb) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/27/2021) (js) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barkman Honey, LLC..(pc) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barkman Honey, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Barkman Honey, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24308242)Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARKMAN HONEY,LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph H Mizrahi