This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/01/2021 at 08:28:53 (UTC).

Sanchez v. Arrow Electronics, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 Sanchez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Arrow Electronics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10152

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christian Sanchez

Defendant

Arrow Electronics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph H Mizrahi

Attorney at Cohen & Mizrahi LLP

300 Cadman Plaza West, 12Th Floor

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Arrow Electronics, Inc. waiver sent on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021. Document filed by Christian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arrow Electronics, Inc...(jgo) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22910604..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Joseph H Mizrahi. Civil Case Opening Fee of Due: for #1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 12/9/2020..(jgo) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arrow Electronics, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Arrow Electronics, Inc.. Document filed by Christian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arrow Electronics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph H Mizrahi