Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/13/2020 at 09:13:08 (UTC).

Sanchez-Quinones et al v. Hospital de La Concepcion et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Sanchez-Quinones filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Hospital de La Concepcion. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel R. Dominguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01546

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel R. Dominguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Verushka Nuez-Sanchez

Thamary Nuez-Sanchez

Vidalina Sanchez-Quiones

Thamary Nunez-Sanchez

Verushka Nunez-Sanchez

Defendants

Edwin Casiano-Santiago

Heriberto Sanchez-Guzman

Hospital La Concepcion

Rosana Otao-Lopez

Hospital Metropolitano San German

CNA Insurance Co.

Policlinica Bernice Guerra

Triple-S Propiedad Inc.

Conjugal Partnership Casiano-Doe

Jane Doe 1

Conjugal Partnership Doe-Otano

Conjugal Partnership Sanchez-Doe 2

John Doe

Jane Doe 2

Rosana Otano-Lopez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer

Attorney at Rivera Mercado & Rivera Cordero

Po Box 192376

San Juan, PR 00919-2376

Defendant Attorneys

Gloria M. De-Corral-Hernandez

Attorney at De Corral & De Mier, LLP

130 Eleanor Roosevelt

San Juan, PR 00918-3105

Jose H. Vivas

Attorney at Vivas & Vivas

P.O. Box 330951

Ponce, PR 00733-0951

Other Attorneys

Reinaldo Calderon-Jimenez

Attorney at Calderon & Arroyo Law Offices

Po Box 195659

San Juan, PR 00919-5659

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MOTION for extension of time until 1/11/2021 to plead filed by Gloria M. De-Corral-Hernandez on behalf of Hospital Metropolitano San German Responses due by 12/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (De-Corral-Hernandez, Gloria) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to All Plaintiffs, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Rosana Otano-Lopez Responses due by 12/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vivas, Jose) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint filed by Reinaldo Calderon-Jimenez on behalf of Hospital de La Concepcion Responses due by 12/21/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Calderon-Jimenez, Reinaldo) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to CNA Insurance Co., Edwin Casiano-Santiago, Hospital La Concepcion, Hospital Metropolitano San German, Rosana Otano-Lopez, Policlinica Bernice Guerra, Heriberto Sanchez-Guzman, Triple-S Propiedad Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

2 #8

Summons Policlinica Bernice

2 #6

Summons Dr. Heriberto Sanchez

2 #4

Summons Hospital Metropolitano

2 #3

Summons Hospital Concepcion

2 #2

Summons CNA

2 #1

Summons Dr. Casiano

#2

(#2) MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Dr. Casiano, #2 Summons CNA, #3 Summons Hospital Concepcion, #4 Summons Hospital Metropolitano, #5 Summons Dr. Rosana Otao, #6 Summons Dr. Heriberto Sanchez, #7 Summons Triple- S Propiedad, #8 Summons Policlinica Bernice)(Rivera-Vaquer, Javier) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Category Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7050845.), filed by Thamary Nuez-Sanchez, Verushka Nuez-Sanchez, Vidalina Sanchez-Quiones. Service due by 1/12/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rivera-Vaquer, Javier) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for extension of time to Answer or otherwise plead. Answer deadline due by 1/11/2021. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/11/2020. (CBM) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for extension of time until 1/11/2021 to plead filed by Gloria M. De-Corral-Hernandez on behalf of Hospital Metropolitano San German Responses due by 12/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (De-Corral-Hernandez, Gloria) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to All Plaintiffs, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Rosana Otano-Lopez Responses due by 12/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vivas, Jose) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise plead. Answer deadline due by 1/7/2021. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/7/2020. (CBM) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Thamary Nunez-Sanchez, Verushka Nunez-Sanchez, Vidalina Sanchez-Quinones filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Rosana Otano-Lopez Responses due by 12/21/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Vivas, Jose) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or otherwise plead. Answer deadline due by 1/7/2021. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/7/2020. (CBM) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint filed by Reinaldo Calderon-Jimenez on behalf of Hospital de La Concepcion Responses due by 12/21/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Calderon-Jimenez, Reinaldo) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to CNA Insurance Co., Edwin Casiano-Santiago, Hospital La Concepcion, Hospital Metropolitano San German, Rosana Otano-Lopez, Policlinica Bernice Guerra, Heriberto Sanchez-Guzman, Triple-S Propiedad Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Summons. The Clerk of Court is to issue the summons enclosed as part of Docket No. #2 . Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/15/2020. (CBM) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Dr. Casiano, #2 Summons CNA, #3 Summons Hospital Concepcion, #4 Summons Hospital Metropolitano, #5 Summons Dr. Rosana Otao, #6 Summons Dr. Heriberto Sanchez, #7 Summons Triple- S Propiedad, #8 Summons Policlinica Bernice)(Rivera-Vaquer, Javier) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7050845.), filed by Thamary Nuez-Sanchez, Verushka Nuez-Sanchez, Vidalina Sanchez-Quiones. Service due by 1/12/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rivera-Vaquer, Javier) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Triple S Propiedad Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CNA INSURANCE CO is a litigant