This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/28/2020 at 14:39:34 (UTC).

Sanchez v. Anco Insulations, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 Sanchez filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Anco Insulations, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick, Scott D. Johnson and Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00325

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judges

Scott D. Johnson

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elridge Joseph Sanchez, Jr.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Grefco, Inc.

John Crane, Inc.

IDEX Corporation

Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc.

The Travelers Indemnity Company

The McCarty Corporation

Crane Co.

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Warren Pumps LLC

Foster Wheeler Corporation

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Monsanto Company

General Electric Company

Liberty Mutual Group Inc.

Crosby Valve, LLC

Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

OneBeacon America Insurance Company

Defendant and Cross Claimant

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

53 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Mitchell F Tedesco

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius

1000 Louisiana St, Suite 4000

Housotn, TX 77098

Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1000 Louisiana, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

James Richard Guidry

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Angela M. Bowlin

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Daniel Edwin Oser

Attorney at Pugh Accardo Haas Radecker & Carey, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, 3300, 70163, Ste 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Joseph Henry Hart, IV

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Thomas A. Porteous

Attorney at Pugh Accardo

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163-1132

Milele N. St. Julien

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Schell Weiner Richeson

1615 Poydras St., Ste. 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Kathleen Jordan

Attorney at Pugh Accardo Haas Radecker & Carey, LLC

1100 Poydras St., Ste 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin, Fritchie, Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward W. Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Blaine A. Moore

616 Girod Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin, Fritchie, Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward W. Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Other Attorneys

Elizabeth Riddell Penn

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Walter G. Watkins, III

Attorney at Forman, Perry, Watkins, Krutz & Tardy - JAC

P.O. Box 22608, 200 S. Lamar St., Suite 100

Jackson, MS 39225-2608

Daniel Steven Roberts

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

P O Box 22608

Jackson, MS 39225

Mary Arthur

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Thomas Peyton Smith

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Regions Building, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Marc Edward Devenport

Attorney at Leake & Andersson, LLP

1700 Energy Centre, 1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

Brittney Bullock Ankersen

Attorney at Courington Kiefer & Sommers, LLC

616 Girod Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward T. Hayes

Attorney at Leake and Andersson, LLP

1700 Energy Centre, 1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

53 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#63

#62

#61

#60

#59

#58

#57

#56

#5

#3

#2

1 #6

Attachment State Court Record Part 2

1 #5

Attachment State Court Record Part 1

1 #4

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Affidavit of Norman Hall

1 #2

Exhibit B - Depo Transcript of Sanchez

1 #1

Exhibit A - Original Petition for Damages

#1

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The McCarty Corporation. (Oubre, Louis) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Long, Kelly) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Original Petition for Damages by General Electric Company.(Long, Kelly) Modified on 7/24/2020 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Corporation identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler Corporation.. (Long, Kelly) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Original Petition for Damages by Foster Wheeler Corporation.(Long, Kelly) Modified on 7/24/2020 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Original Petition for Damages by General Electric Company.(Long, Kelly) Modified on 7/24/2020 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation.. (Long, Kelly) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #3 Answer to Original Petition for Damages by CBS Corporation.(Long, Kelly) Modified on 7/24/2020 to edit text.(EDC). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation. (Bowlin, Angela) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ANSWER to Complaint by FMC Corporation.(Bowlin, Angela) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crown Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Crown Holdings, Inc. for Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc... (Lonegrass, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, Inc., CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Crosby Valve, LLC, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., FMC Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Grefco, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., IDEX Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, International Paper Company, John Crane, Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Pharmacia, LLC, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Foster Wheeler Corporation. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Submitted (Melancon, David) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 4 Answer to Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 4 Answer to Complaint by OneBeacon America Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosamond, Samuel) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docket(#4) STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD ANSWER to Complaint by OneBeacon America Insurance Company.(Rosamond, Samuel) Modified on 6/10/2020 STRICKEN as ordered (ELW). (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Request for Jury Trial, CROSS-CLAIMS against Bayer CropScience, Inc., CBS Corporation, CSR, Limited, Crane Co., Crosby Valve, LLC, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps (IPG), Inc., Grefco, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., IDEX Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, International Paper Company, John Crane, Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Monsanto Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) Modified on 6/2/2020 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by OneBeacon America Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited, Corporate Parent Lamorak Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc. for OneBeacon America Insurance Company.. (Rosamond, Samuel) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Case Number 695862. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2119799), filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - Depo Transcript of Sanchez, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Norman Hall, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Attachment State Court Record Part 1, #6 Attachment State Court Record Part 2)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IDEX Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Grefco, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Onebeacon America Insurance Company On Behalf Of is a litigant

Latest cases where McCarty Corporation is a litigant