This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/12/2023 at 08:42:56 (UTC).

Sanchez Guillen v. Cash Construction Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 Sanchez Guillen filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Cash Construction Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00271

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Macedonio Sanchez Guillen

Defendants

Cash Construction Company, Inc.

National American Insurance Company

Chad Williams

Richard Pena

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibits 1-13

1 #2

Exhibit 14

1 #3

Exhibits

1 #4

Complaint Cover Sheet

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Macedonio Sanchez Guillen.. Motions referred to Judge Dustin M. Howell. (dm) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

#3

(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin M. Howell. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Dustin M. Howell. (dm) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

#4

(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Macedonio Sanchez Guillen. The Court GRANTS #2 Plaintiff's MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis and RECOMMENDS that the Complaint be dismissed. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (jv2) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#5

(#5) Certified Mail Receipt for copy of #4 Report and Recommendation sent to Macedonio Sanchez Guillen via certified mail. (jv2) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#6

(#6) Certified mail acknowledgment receipt for magistrate report and recommendations re #4 Report and Recommendations as to Macedonio Sanchez Guillen. (jv2) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certified mail acknowledgment receipt for magistrate report and recommendations re #4 Report and Recommendations as to Macedonio Sanchez Guillen. (jv2) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certified Mail Receipt for copy of #4 Report and Recommendation sent to Macedonio Sanchez Guillen via certified mail. (jv2) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • DocketCASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dustin M. Howell. (jv2) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Macedonio Sanchez Guillen. The Court GRANTS #2 Plaintiff's MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis and RECOMMENDS that the Complaint be dismissed. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (jv2) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction Personal Identifiers. Please be advised that exhibits submitted in support of the #1 Complaint, contain personal identifiers and have been placed under seal. In accordance with the E-Government Act of 2002, and in order to promote electronic access to case files while also protecting personal privacy, rules providing protection for case file records took effect on December 1, 2007.Parties should either exclude sensitive information in any documents filed with the court, or partially redact such sensitive information where inclusion is necessary and relevant to the case. All filers are encouraged to reference the Amended Privacy Policy and Public Access to Electronic Files, which details the rules of this court regarding redaction of personal identifiers. (jv2) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin M. Howell. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Dustin M. Howell. (dm) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Macedonio Sanchez Guillen.. Motions referred to Judge Dustin M. Howell. (dm) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Macedonio Sanchez Guillen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-13, #2 Exhibit 14, #3 Exhibits, #4 Complaint Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(dm) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less