This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2022 at 06:32:20 (UTC).

Sanchez et al v. Lexington Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Sanchez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lexington Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Williams and Chris M. McAliley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-21547

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Chris M. McAliley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rafael J Sanchez

Karelia J Sanchez

Defendant

Lexington Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas A Singer

Attorney at Gladys A. Cardenas, P.A.

829 Ne 79 Street

Miami, FL 33138

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher James Tracey, Jr.

Attorney at Berk Merchant , Sims, PLC

2 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 700

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Melissa M. Sims

Attorney at Berk, Merchant & Sims, PLC

2 Alhambra Plaza, Suite 700

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) JUDICIAL DISCLOSURE. Under 28 U.S.C. 455(a), a judge must recuse herself in a proceeding where her impartiality might reasonably be questioned. But recusal under 455(a) may be waived by the parties after full disclosure. Parker v. Connors Steel Co., 855 F.2d 1510, 1527 (11th Cir. 1988). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ayesa Conger on behalf of Karelia J Sanchez, Rafael J Sanchez. Attorney Ayesa Conger added to party Karelia J Sanchez(pty:pla), Attorney Ayesa Conger added to party Rafael J Sanchez(pty:pla). (Conger, Ayesa) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley all non-dispositive pretrial motions. Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#3

(#3) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc.,, subsidiary of AIG Property Casualty, Inc., subsidiary olf American International Group, Inc., a publicly-held corporation, Other Affiliate Master Claims for Lexington Insurance Company (Sims, Melissa) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

1 #22

Exhibit 21 - Defendant's Notice to State Court of Removal

1 #19

Exhibit 18 - Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Pr

1 #17

Exhibit 16 - Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Affirmative Defenses

1 #16

Exhibit 15 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Original Notice of Service of Pro

1 #15

Exhibit 14 - Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs'

1 #13

Exhibit 12 - Defense Counsel's Notice of Appearance

1 #9

Exhibit 8 - Plaintiffs' First Request to Produce

1 #7

Exhibit 6 - Sweet Claims Estimate

1 #6

Exhibit 5 - Policy

1 #5

Exhibit 4 - Master Claims Estimate

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Declaration in Support of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JUDICIAL DISCLOSURE. Under 28 U.S.C. 455(a), a judge must recuse herself in a proceeding where her impartiality might reasonably be questioned. But recusal under 455(a) may be waived by the parties after full disclosure. Parker v. Connors Steel Co., 855 F.2d 1510, 1527 (11th Cir. 1988). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 5/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ayesa Conger on behalf of Karelia J Sanchez, Rafael J Sanchez. Attorney Ayesa Conger added to party Karelia J Sanchez(pty:pla), Attorney Ayesa Conger added to party Rafael J Sanchez(pty:pla). (Conger, Ayesa) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley all non-dispositive pretrial motions. Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc.,, subsidiary of AIG Property Casualty, Inc., subsidiary olf American International Group, Inc., a publicly-held corporation, Other Affiliate Master Claims for Lexington Insurance Company (Sims, Melissa) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15651079, answer and affirmative defenses filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Service of Process, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration in Support of Removal, #5 Exhibit 4 - Master Claims Estimate, #6 Exhibit 5 - Policy, #7 Exhibit 6 - Sweet Claims Estimate, #8 Exhibit 7 - Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant, #9 Exhibit 8 - Plaintiffs' First Request to Produce, #10 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiffs' First Request for Admissions, #11 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Policy, #12 Exhibit 11 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Request for Deposition Dates, #13 Exhibit 12 - Defense Counsel's Notice of Appearance, #14 Exhibit 13 - Defense Counsel's Notice of E-Mail Designation, #15 Exhibit 14 - Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #16 Exhibit 15 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Original Notice of Service of Process, #17 Exhibit 16 - Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Affirmative Defenses, #18 Exhibit 17 - Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, #19 Exhibit 18 - Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents, #20 Exhibit 19 - Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Admissions, #21 Exhibit 20 - Uniform Order Setting Cause for Jury Trial, Mediation, and Pre-Trial Instructions, #22 Exhibit 21 - Defendant's Notice to State Court of Removal)(Sims, Melissa) Modified on 5/19/2022 (mee). (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa M. Sims