This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/27/2022 at 07:45:46 (UTC).

Margarito Sanchez Diaz v. Ford Motor Company et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Margarito Sanchez Diaz filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Josephine L. Staton and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02849

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Margarito Sanchez Diaz

Defendants

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Y Jacobson

Attorney at Quill and Arrow LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Gregory Sogoyan

Attorney at Quill and Arrow LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorney

Matthew M Proudfoot

Attorney at Gates Conter Guy Proudfoot and Muench LLP

38 Discovery Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons & Complaint - State Court

1 #2

Answer to Complaint - State Court

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, identifying FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton. On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing Friday, June 24, 2022, is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: August 19, 2022; Fact Discovery Cutoff: March 24, 2023; Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): April 7, 2023; Last Day to Serve Initial Expert Reports: April 7, 2023; Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports: May 5, 2023;Expert Discovery Cutoff: June 2, 2023; Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: May 26, 2023; Last Day to File Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions: October 27, 2023; Final Pretrial Conference (10:30 a.m.): December 1, 2023; Preliminary Trial Estimate: 4 Days. (lom) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • Docket(#11) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Margarito Sanchez Diaz.. (Cohen, Aaron) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. A Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2022 at 11:30 a.m. See attached order for details. (droj) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON upon filing of the complaint. (droj) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/14/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Margarito Sanchez Diaz. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, identifying FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 22STCV05669 Receipt No: ACACDC-33208609 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Millard Proudfoot