This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 08:51:40 (UTC).

San Leandro Unified School District v. Cephalon, Inc.,et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 San Leandro Unified School District filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Cephalon, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45114

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

San Leandro Unified School District, a local education agency

Defendants

CEPHALON, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.,

ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

ORTH-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC., n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

Johnson & Johnson, Inc.

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

MALLINCKRODT, PLC

Mallinckrodt, LLC

Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.;

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

Cardinal Health, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

CVS Health Corporation

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William B. Shinoff

Attorney at Frantz Law

402 West Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Jade S. Koller

Attorney at Frantz Law

402 West Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Attorney Appearance by Jade S. Koller filed on behalf of San Leandro Unified School District.(P,R) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (P,R) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (P,R) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by San Leandro Unified School District, a local education agency. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Shinoff, William) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Attorney Appearance by Jade S. Koller filed on behalf of San Leandro Unified School District.(P,R) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11152068. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804. Filed by San Leandro Unified School District, a local education agency. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shinoff, William) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLERGAN PLC f/k/a ACTAVIS PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Health Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Insys Therapeutics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant