This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2019 at 07:00:36 (UTC).

San Francisco Baykeeper et al v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 San Francisco Baykeeper filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against U S Environmental Protection Agency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sallie Kim and William Alsup. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-05941

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sallie Kim

William Alsup

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Save The Bay

Citizens' Committee to Complete the Refuge

Committee for Green Foothills

San Francisco Baykeeper

Defendants

Andrew R. Wheeler

United States Environmental Protection Agency

U.S. Environmental Protection Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sarvenaz Josephine Fahimi

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Eric James Buescher

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Paul N. McCloskey, Jr.

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Joseph W. Cotchett

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Nicole Chiyeko Sasaki

Attorney at San Francisco Baykeeper

1736 Franklin Street, Suite 800

Oakland, CA 94612

Allison Michelle LaPlante

Attorney at Earthrise Law Center

10015 S.W. Terwilliger Boulevard

Portland, OR 97219

Jamie Neville Saul

Attorney at Earthrise Law Center

10015 Sw Terwilliger Blvd.

Portland, OR 97219

James Saul

Attorney at Earthrise Law Center

10015 S.W. Terwilliger Boulevard

Portland, OR 97219

Defendant Attorney

Andrew J Doyle

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 23986

Washington, DC 20026-3986

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Allison Michelle LaPlante. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

22 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#22

(#22) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13821478.) filed by San Francisco Baykeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(LaPlante, Allison) (Filed on 10/24/2019) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#21

(#21) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney James N. Saul.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#20

(#20) Second MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of James Saul ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26KKBFRK.) Filing fee previously paid on October 3, 2019 filed by San Francisco Baykeeper. (Saul, Jamie) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Judge William Alsup denying #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for James N. Saul.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#16

(#16) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew R. Wheeler, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency.. (Doyle, Andrew) (Filed on 10/4/2019) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

14 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#14

(#18) ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Judge William Alsup denying #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for James N. Saul.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Defendant Andrew R. Wheeler. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Defendant U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/30/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarvenaz Josephine Fahimi on behalf of Plaintiffs Save the Bay, Committee for Green Foothills, and Citizens' Committee to Complete the Refuge (Fahimi, Sarvenaz) (Filed on 9/24/2019) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric James Buescher on behalf of Plaintiffs Save the Bay, Committee for Green Foothills, and Citizens' Committee to Complete the Refuge (Buescher, Eric) (Filed on 9/24/2019) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 9/24/2019) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 9/24/2019) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971- 13730185). Filed by San Francisco Baykeeper, Citizens' Committee to Complete the Refuge, Committee for Green Foothills, Save The Bay. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 9/24/2019) Modified on 9/25/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/24/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Allison Michelle LaPlante. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13821478.) filed by San Francisco Baykeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(LaPlante, Allison) (Filed on 10/24/2019) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney James N. Saul.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Second MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of James Saul ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26KKBFRK.) Filing fee previously paid on October 3, 2019 filed by San Francisco Baykeeper. (Saul, Jamie) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • (#19) CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UPON REASSIGNMENT - Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/2/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Judge William Alsup denying #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for James N. Saul.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Case Reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • (#17) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew R. Wheeler, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency.. (Doyle, Andrew) (Filed on 10/4/2019) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Francisco Baykeeper.. (Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 10/3/2019) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Citizens' Committee to Complete the Refuge, Committee for Green Foothills, Save The Bay. Responses due by 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buescher, Eric) (Filed on 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Defendant Andrew R. Wheeler. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Defendant U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/30/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarvenaz Josephine Fahimi on behalf of Plaintiffs Save the Bay, Committee for Green Foothills, and Citizens' Committee to Complete the Refuge (Fahimi, Sarvenaz) (Filed on 9/24/2019) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric James Buescher on behalf of Plaintiffs Save the Bay, Committee for Green Foothills, and Citizens' Committee to Complete the Refuge (Buescher, Eric) (Filed on 9/24/2019) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/8/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 9/24/2019) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 9/24/2019) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971- 13730185). Filed by San Francisco Baykeeper, Citizens' Committee to Complete the Refuge, Committee for Green Foothills, Save The Bay. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 9/24/2019) Modified on 9/25/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Save, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Environmental Protection Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant