This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2022 at 08:30:41 (UTC).

San Enterprises, LLC et al v. BMW of North America, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 San Enterprises, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J Trenga and Ivan D. Davis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00818

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J Trenga

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

San Enterprises, LLC

42396 Ryan Road, Suite 112-142

Ashburn, VA 20176

Sophia A. Nelson

Ashburn, VA 20176

Defendant

BMW of North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Aaron Cluett

Attorney at Lemon Law Group Partners

1518 Willow Lawn Drive

Richmond, VA 23230

Defendant Attorney

Anthony Michael Conti

Attorney at Conti Fenn & Lawrence PLLC

36 South Charles Street, Suite 2501

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan #10 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 21, 2022, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's August 26, 2022, Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 9/15/2022. (lgue, ) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

#10

(#10) Joint Discovery Plan by BMW of North America, LLC.(Conti, Anthony) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

9 #4

Exhibit D Preservation Notice

9 #3

Exhibit C Repair Orders

9 #2

Exhibit B Overview of BMW Warranties

9 #1

Exhibit A Lease

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by San Enterprises, LLC, Sophia A. Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Lease, #2 Exhibit B Overview of BMW Warranties, #3 Exhibit C Repair Orders, #4 Exhibit D Preservation Notice)(Cluett, William) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

6 #13

Exhibit 11

6 #12

Exhibit 10

6 #11

Exhibit 9

6 #10

Exhibit 8

6 #9

Exhibit 7

6 #8

Exhibit 6

6 #6

Exhibit 4

6 #3

Exhibit 1

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Memorandum

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Conti, Anthony) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan #10 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 21, 2022, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's August 26, 2022, Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 9/15/2022. (lgue, ) (Entered: 09/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint Discovery Plan by BMW of North America, LLC.(Conti, Anthony) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by San Enterprises, LLC, Sophia A. Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Lease, #2 Exhibit B Overview of BMW Warranties, #3 Exhibit C Repair Orders, #4 Exhibit D Preservation Notice)(Cluett, William) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, ) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Hearing Date set for 10/26/2022 re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Conti, Anthony) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2022 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 1/13/2023. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 8/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Conti, Anthony) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that per the agreement of the parties, Defendant BMW of North America, LLC shall have until August 27, 2022 to file a response to the Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 8/2/2022. (swil) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Conti, Anthony) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (kgall) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMW of North America, LLC. (Conti, Anthony) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by BMW of North America, LLC Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Conti, Anthony) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8483178.), filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Conti, Anthony) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Michael Conti