This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/13/2020 at 07:48:25 (UTC).

San Carlos Apache Tribe v. Azar et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 San Carlos Apache Tribe filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Azar. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Neil V Wake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05624

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Neil V Wake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

San Carlos Apache Tribe

Defendants

Alex Azar

United States of America

Michael Weahkee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rebecca A Patterson

Attorney at Sonosky Chambers Sachse Miller & Munson LLP

900 W 5Th Ave., Ste. 700

Anchorage, AK 99501

Alexander Bennett Ritchie

Attorney at San Carlos Apache Tribe

P.O. Box 40

San Carlos, AZ 85550

Lloyd B Miller

Attorney at Sonosky Chambers Sachse Miller & Munson LLP

900 W 5Th Ave., Ste. 700

Anchorage, AK 99501

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Exhibit USPS Online Verification

12 #1

Exhibit Return Receipts

#12

(#12) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by San Carlos Apache Tribe: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint, Notice re: MIDPP, and Order re: FRCP 12(b) & (c) Motions upon Defendants on November 21 and 22, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipts, #2 Exhibit USPS Online Verification)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

11 #3

Summons

11 #2

Summons

11 #1

Summons

#11

(#11) Summons Issued as to Alex Azar, Michael Weahkee, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAS) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Submitted by San Carlos Apache Tribe. (Ritchie, Alexander) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Submitted by San Carlos Apache Tribe. (Ritchie, Alexander) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Submitted by San Carlos Apache Tribe. (Ritchie, Alexander) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Submitted by San Carlos Apache Tribe. (Ritchie, Alexander) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 11/14/19. (SLQ) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#5

(#5) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff San Carlos Apache Tribe. (Ritchie, Alexander) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit Ex. 3, 7/10/19 Decision & Counterclaim

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. 2, 9/28/17 Claim Letter

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1, 2007 IHS Manual, Pt. 6, Ch. 3, Part 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17632393 filed by San Carlos Apache Tribe. (Ritchie, Alexander) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, 2007 IHS Manual, Pt. 6, Ch. 3, Part 1, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, 9/28/17 Claim Letter, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, 7/10/19 Decision & Counterclaim)(BAC) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by San Carlos Apache Tribe: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint, Notice re: MIDPP, and Order re: FRCP 12(b) & (c) Motions upon Defendants on November 21 and 22, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipts, #2 Exhibit USPS Online Verification)(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Summons Issued as to Alex Azar, Michael Weahkee, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAS) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Lloyd B Miller and Rebecca A Patterson on behalf of Plaintiff San Carlos Apache Tribe. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Submitted by San Carlos Apache Tribe. (Ritchie, Alexander) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Submitted by San Carlos Apache Tribe. (Ritchie, Alexander) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Submitted by San Carlos Apache Tribe. (Ritchie, Alexander) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Submitted by San Carlos Apache Tribe. (Ritchie, Alexander) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 11/14/19. (SLQ) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff San Carlos Apache Tribe. (Ritchie, Alexander) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by San Carlos Apache Tribe. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file the Civil Cover Sheet. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17632393. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Senior Judge Neil V Wake. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-05624-PHX-NVW. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17632393 filed by San Carlos Apache Tribe. (Ritchie, Alexander) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, 2007 IHS Manual, Pt. 6, Ch. 3, Part 1, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, 9/28/17 Claim Letter, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, 7/10/19 Decision & Counterclaim)(BAC) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca A Patterson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander B. Ritchie

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lloyd B. Miller