This case was last updated from PACER on 04/11/2021 at 09:15:15 (UTC).

Samuels v. Renaissance Hotel Operating Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 Samuels filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Renaissance Hotel Operating Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael S. Nachmanoff and Anthony J Trenga. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00149

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael S. Nachmanoff

Presiding Judge

Anthony J Trenga

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Venice Samuels

Defendants

Courtyard Management Corporation

Renaissance Hotel Operating Company

JBG/Potomac Yards Hotel, I, LLLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John S. Lopatto, III

Attorney at Law Offices of John Lopatto

1776 K St Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorney

Julia Bougie Judkins

Attorney at Bancroft McGavin Horvath & Judkins PC

9990 Fairfax Blvd., Suite 400

Fairfax, VA 22030

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - This matter comes before the Court on the parties Rule 26(f) report (Dkt. No. #4 ). Based on the parties representations in their discovery plan, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Pretrial Conference scheduled for March 10, 2020 shall be canceled. Upon review of the pleadings and the record, the court makes the following rulings:1. The Rule 26(f) report (Dkt. No. #4 ) filed by the parties is approved unless modified by the court herein or hereafter (See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 3/5/2021.(lcre, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#4

(#4) Joint Discovery Plan by Courtyard Management Corporation, JBG/Potomac Yards Hotel, I, LLLC, Renaissance Hotel Operating Company.(Judkins, Julia) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

3 #2

Pretrial Notice

3 #1

Magistrate Consent

#3

(#3) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 6/11/2021. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 2/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Courtyard Management Corporation, JBG/Potomac Yards Hotel, I, LLLC, Renaissance Hotel Operating Company.(Judkins, Julia) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit C - Corporation Entity

1 #3

Exhibit B - State NOR

1 #2

Exhibit A - Compl. and A. Compl.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7621272.), filed by Courtyard Management Corporation, JBG/Potomac Yards Hotel, I, LLLC, Renaissance Hotel Operating Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Compl. and A. Compl., #3 Exhibit B - State NOR, #4 Exhibit C - Corporation Entity)(Judkins, Julia) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - This matter comes before the Court on the parties Rule 26(f) report (Dkt. No. #4 ). Based on the parties representations in their discovery plan, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Pretrial Conference scheduled for March 10, 2020 shall be canceled. Upon review of the pleadings and the record, the court makes the following rulings:1. The Rule 26(f) report (Dkt. No. #4 ) filed by the parties is approved unless modified by the court herein or hereafter (See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 3/5/2021.(lcre, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketInitial Pretrial Conference set for 03/10/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff TERMINATED. (lcre, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint Discovery Plan by Courtyard Management Corporation, JBG/Potomac Yards Hotel, I, LLLC, Renaissance Hotel Operating Company.(Judkins, Julia) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 6/11/2021. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 2/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (aott, ) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Courtyard Management Corporation, JBG/Potomac Yards Hotel, I, LLLC, Renaissance Hotel Operating Company.(Judkins, Julia) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7621272.), filed by Courtyard Management Corporation, JBG/Potomac Yards Hotel, I, LLLC, Renaissance Hotel Operating Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Compl. and A. Compl., #3 Exhibit B - State NOR, #4 Exhibit C - Corporation Entity)(Judkins, Julia) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COURTYARD MANAGEMENT CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Renaissance Hotel Operating Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Simon Lopatto III