This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2020 at 09:17:52 (UTC).

Samuel v. PMAB, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Samuel filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against PMAB, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen Michael Doyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00799

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen Michael Doyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karisky Samuel

Defendant

PMAB, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Landreau

Attorney at Landreau Firm, LLC

22142 W Nine Mile Rd

Southfield, MI 48033

 

Court Documents

5 #2

Exhibit Correspondence

5 #1

Exhibit Correspondence

#5

(#5) MOTION for Matthew J. Landreau to Withdraw as Attorney by Karisky Samuel. (with Proof of Service and Brief in Support contained in main document pdf)(Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence, #2 Exhibit Correspondence)(Landreau, Matthew) Modified on 11/10/2020 (dmn, ). (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Karisky Samuel. (amf, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Karisky Samuel. (Landreau, Matthew) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to PMAB, LLC; Returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (amf, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Filing Fee Receipt

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PMAB, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602859716.), filed by Karisky Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Filing Fee Receipt, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Karisky Samuel. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #5 for pdf; incorporated in main document pdf) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Matthew J. Landreau to Withdraw as Attorney by Karisky Samuel. (with Proof of Service and Brief in Support contained in main document pdf)(Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence, #2 Exhibit Correspondence)(Landreau, Matthew) Modified on 11/10/2020 (dmn, ). (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Karisky Samuel. (amf, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Karisky Samuel. (Landreau, Matthew) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to PMAB, LLC; Returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (amf, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Karisky Samuel. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 for pdf) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PMAB, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602859716.), filed by Karisky Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Filing Fee Receipt, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PMAB, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew J Landreau