This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 05:50:49 (UTC).

Samuel v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 Samuel filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ann M Donnelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04973

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ann M Donnelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leroy Samuel

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harold Skovronsky

1810 Avenue N

Brooklyn, NY 11230

Defendant Attorney

SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC

Attorney at Social Security Administration

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: The Commissioner will obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below, and will file the record by January 14, 2021. By February 15, 2021, counsel for the plaintiff must send a written settlement proposal to counsel for the Commissioner, summarizing the plaintiffs strongest arguments, with specific references to the portions of the record supporting those arguments, to determine if the case can be resolved. By March 17, 2021, the parties must file a stipulation dismissing, remanding or otherwise resolving the case, or a joint letter stating that they intend to proceed to briefing on their respective positions. If the parties are not able to resolve the case, the plaintiff will file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by April 16, 2021; the Commissioner will file and serve its response to the plaintiff's motion by June 15, 2021; the plaintiff will file and serve a reply, if any, by July 6, 2021. The parties are to comply in all respects with applicable Local Rules for this district and this Courts Individual Practices and Rules, including but not limited to the Courts Individual Practice and Rules 1(D) and 4(C) regarding proper courtesy copy procedure and legal memoranda page limitations (i.e., 25 pages for opening and opposition briefs, and 10 pages for reply briefs). The parties are reminded to ensure all legal memoranda include citations to the record. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 10/16/2020. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: The Commissioner will obtain the administrative record of the proceedings below, and will file the record by January 14, 2021. By February 15, 2021, counsel for the plaintiff must send a written settlement proposal to counsel for the Commissioner, summarizing the plaintiffs strongest arguments, with specific references to the portions of the record supporting those arguments, to determine if the case can be resolved. By March 17, 2021, the parties must file a stipulation dismissing, remanding or otherwise resolving the case, or a joint letter stating that they intend to proceed to briefing on their respective positions. If the parties are not able to resolve the case, the plaintiff will file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by April 16, 2021; the Commissioner will file and serve its response to the plaintiff's motion by June 15, 2021; the plaintiff will file and serve a reply, if any, by July 6, 2021. The parties are to comply in all respects with applicable Local Rules for this district and this Courts Individual Practices and Rules, including but not limited to the Courts Individual Practice and Rules 1(D) and 4(C) regarding proper courtesy copy procedure and legal memoranda page limitations (i.e., 25 pages for opening and opposition briefs, and 10 pages for reply briefs). The parties are reminded to ensure all legal memoranda include citations to the record. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 10/16/2020. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13535097 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Leroy Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Skovronsky, Harold) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less