This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2021 at 08:17:50 (UTC).

Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. et al v. Solas Oled LTD. et al

Case Summary

On June 11, 2021, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. ("SEC") and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. ("SEA" and, collectively, "Samsung Electronics" or “Plaintiffs”), represented by Abby Faith Rudzin of O'Melveny & Myers LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Solas Oled Ltd. ("Solas") and Neodron Ltd. (''Neodron") (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking declaratory judgment for alleged non-infringement of U.S. Patents owned by the Defendant. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Southern District of New York with Judge Lorna G. Schofield presiding.

 

The Plaintiffs filed this complaint for the declaratory judgement for alleged non-infringement of the US Patent No. 7,573,068 (the “’068 Patent”), 7,868,880 (the “’880 Patent”), 9,292,144 (’144 Patent), 8,526,767 (the “’767 Patent”), 7,499,042 (the “’042 Patent”) and 7,663,615 (the “’615 Patent”) (collectively, the “Patents-in-Suit”).

 

In their complaint, the Plaintiffs have alleged that “ Neodron and Solas have engaged in a relentless campaign of litigation against Samsung. Neodron and Solas are "patent trolls" owned by the same hedge fund-Magnetar Capital. Neodron and Solas buy patents not to use the patented technology, but to accuse others of infringement. They hope to obtain large damage awards or, more often, extort settlement payments for unnecessary licenses to practice the patents. Between the two of them, they have filed no fewer than twelve lawsuits in the United States since May 2019 against members of the Samsung family.”

 

The Plaintiffs further alleged that “Neodron and Samsung Electronics agreed to settle their disputes, with Neodron dismissing its Texas actions with prejudice and dropping the ITC investigation and Samsung Electronics dismissing its Texas counterclaims with prejudice and dropping the related inter partes reviews then pending before the Patent Trial and Appeals Board. In connection with the settlement, Neodron and the SEC entered into the License Agreement.”

 

The Plaintiffs also alleged that “Neodron agreed to license all of the “Patents,” as defined in the PLA, to Samsung Electronics. Now Defendants assert that the ’144 Patent is not licensed even though it is one of the Patents and have implicitly threatened further litigation based on the ’144 Patent. Neodron’s repudiation of the licenses and implicit threats of further litigation on the ’144 Patent breaches the PLA.”

 

There are eight claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiffs, wherein breach of contract, declaratory judgement for practising the Patent-in-suit, and the declaratory judgement for non-infringement of Patent-in-suit has been alleged.

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs have requested the Court to enter a judgment in favor of Samsung Electronics and against Defendants on all claims and causes of action set forth, to pass a judgment for breach of the License Agreement and an award of monetary damages for such breach, a declaration that Samsung Electronics is licensed to practice the “Patents,” including the Patents-in-Suit, a declaration that Defendants are “Licensors” under the License Agreement, a declaration that Samsung Electronics has not infringed the Patents-in- Suit, literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, and a declaration that this case is exceptional under 35 U.S.C. § 285 and grant costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.




Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05205

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Defendants

Solas Oled LTD.

Neodron LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Abby Faith Rudzin

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Daniel Sean Trainor

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1625 Eye Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Darin Walter Snyder

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, 28Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

John Kappos

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

610 Newport Center Drive, 17Th Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Laura Bayne Gore

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP(NYC)

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Nathaniel Legum

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP (SanFran)

Two Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Nicholas Whilt

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP (LA2)

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ryan Ken Yagura

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Shane Hunt

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ, August,& Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd.,, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brett E. Cooper

Attorney at Russ, August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Ste 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Drew Bennett Hollander

Attorney at Russ, August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, Ste 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James Tsuei

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Neil A. Rubin

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Wang on behalf of Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD...(Wang, Philip) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

26 #2

CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing

25 #3

DC Certificate of Good Standing

24 #1

Declaration of Nicholas Whilt in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice

24 #24

Main Document

23 #1

Declaration of Darin Snyder in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice

22 #2

CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing

22 #22

Main Document

21 #21

Main Document

19 #4

Text of Proposed Order

18 #3

CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing

18 #18

Main Document

17 #4

Text of Proposed Order

16 #2

CA State Bar Certificate of Good Standing

15 #3

CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd...(Rudzin, Abby) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(pc) (pc). (Entered: 06/11/2021)

67 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Wang on behalf of Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD...(Wang, Philip) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Ryan Yagura to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #23 Motion for Darin Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #24 Motion for Nicholas Whilt to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #25 Motion for D. Sean Trainor to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #26 Motion for Nathaniel Legum to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion for Philip X. Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion for James S. Tsuei to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion for Marc A. Fenster to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #18 Motion for Reza Mirzaie to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #19 Motion for Neil A. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #21 Motion for John Kappos to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Bayne Gore on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd...(Gore, Laura) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for D. Sean Trainor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870922. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #21 MOTION for John Kappos to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870118. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #22 MOTION for Ryan Yagura to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870481. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #26 MOTION for Nathaniel Legum to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24871117. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #23 MOTION for Darin Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870595. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #24 MOTION for Nicholas Whilt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870727. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shane Hunt on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd...(Hunt, Shane) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Nathaniel Legum to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24871117. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathaniel Legum in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Legum, Nathaniel) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for D. Sean Trainor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870922. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Sean Trainor in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 VA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Trainor, Daniel) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Nicholas Whilt to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870727. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas Whilt in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Whilt, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Darin Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870595. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darin Snyder in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Snyder, Darin) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Ryan Yagura to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24870481. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Yagura in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 CA Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #3 TX Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Yagura, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd...(Rudzin, Abby) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Solas Oled LTD...(pc) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Neodron LTD...(pc) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketREMARK - SEALING ORDER DOCKETED IN 21-MC-485..(pc) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docket(#3) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nmo) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Abby Faith Rudzin to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(pc) (pc). (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Neodron LTD., Solas Oled LTD.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 465401280929)Document filed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(pc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2021: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E, #6 Ex F, #7 Ex G) (pc). (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEODRON LTD., is a litigant

Latest cases where Solas OLED Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Christopher Kappos