This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2021 at 07:19:03 (UTC).

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al v. Lynk Labs, Inc.

Case Summary

On May 17, 2021, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (collectively, “Samsung”), represented by Dennis John Abdelnour and Ron N. Sklar of Honigman LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Lynk Labs, Inc. (“Lynk Labs” or “Defendant”), seeking a declaratory judgment for non-infringement of United States patents owned by Lynk Labs. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Northern District of Illinois with Judge Sylvia H. Rambo presiding.

Samsung filed this complaint for non-infringement of the U.S. Patent Nos. 10,492,252 (“the ’252 Patent”) entitled “AC Light Emitting Diode and AC LED Drive Methods and Apparatus”; 10,499,466 (“the ’466 Patent”) entitled “AC Light Emitting Diode and AC LED Drive Methods and Apparatus”, 10,506,674 (“the ’674 Patent”) entitled “AC Light Emitting Diode and AC LED Drive Methods and Apparatus”,  10,966,298 (“the ’298 Patent”) entitled “AC Light Emitting Diode and AC LED Drive Methods and Apparatus”, U.S. Patent No. 10,492,251 (“the ’251 Patent”) entitled “AC Light Emitting Diode and AC LED Drive Methods and Apparatus”, 10,750,583 (“the ’583 Patent”) entitled “AC Light Emitting Diode and AC LED Drive Methods and Apparatus”, 10,687,400 (“the ’400 Patent”) entitled “AC Light Emitting Diode and AC LED Drive Methods and Apparatus” and 10,517,149 (“the ’149 Patent”) entitled “AC Light Emitting Diode and AC LED Drive Methods and Apparatus”, (collectively, “Patents-in-suit”) owned by the defendant.

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “The Accused Galaxy Products have not infringed, and do not infringe, directly or indirectly, any valid and enforceable claim of the ’252 Patent, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents.” The Plaintiff also alleged that “Samsung does not induce infringement of claims 1-20 of the ’252 Patent because, for at least the reasons stated above, there is no direct infringement of those claims because the Accused Galaxy Products do not satisfy several limitations of those claims.”

The Plaintiff further alleged that “The Accused Galaxy Products do not meet the claim requirement of “a transmission conductor configured to wirelessly receive an alternating electromagnetic field that is used to provide power to charge the apparatus” at least because the transmission conductors of the Accused Galaxy Products, to the extent such conductors exist in the products, do not wirelessly receive an alternating electromagnetic field for providing power to charge the apparatus.”

There are eight claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, each of which claim non infringement of each of the Patents-in-suit.

In the prayer for relief, declaration of non infringement of the Patents-in-suit has been seeked by the Plaintiff along with injunctive reliefs and a declaration that this case is an exceptional case under 35 U.S.C. § 285, and awarding Samsung its costs, expenses, and reasonable attorneys’ fees under 35 U.S.C. § 285 and all other applicable statutes, rules and common law, including this Court’s inherent authority.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02665

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Defendant

Lynk Labs, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dennis John Abdelnour

Attorney at Honigman LLP

155 North Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60606

Ron N. Sklar

Attorney at Honigman LLP

One South Wacker Drive, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60606

Darin W Snyder

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

275 Battery Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111-3305

Marc J. Pensabene

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Ryan Ken Yagura

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

400 S Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2899

D. Sean Trainor

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1625 Eye Street Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Laura Bayne Gore

Attorney at OMELVENY & MYERS LLP

New York, Ny 10036

New York, NY 10036

Nicholas J. Whilt

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

400 S. Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Xin-Yi Zhou

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

400 S. Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

James A Shimota

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60602

Nelson Hua

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

70 W. Madison Street, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#48

(#48) ORDER Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/13/2021: Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc.'s motion for leave to file under seal #46 is granted. (rbf, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#47

(#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Oral argument set for 7/13/2021 at 02:00 p.m. is stricken and reset for 07/23/2021 at 11:00 a.m. and will be conducted via video-conference. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 650-479-3207 the meeting number/access code is 180 659 3247. Counsel of record will receive an email invitation prior to the start of the video hearing with instructions to join the video conference. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. (rbf, ) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#46

(#46) MOTION by Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. to seal document reply, #45 (Shimota, James) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#45

RESTRICTED

44 #5

Ex. D to Hua Declaration

44 #3

Ex. B to Hua Declaration

#44

(#44) REPLY by Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. to motion to dismiss #22 Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Certain Allegations, to Dismiss Counts IV and IX for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and to Transfer Venue (Public/Redacted) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nelson Hua, #2 Ex. A to Hua Declaration, #3 Ex. B to Hua Declaration, #4 Ex. C to Hua Declaration, #5 Ex. D to Hua Declaration)(Shimota, James) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#24

RESTRICTED

#22

(#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer:The parties' request for an oral argument on defendant, Lynk Labs' motion to strike certain allegations to dismiss counts IV and IX for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and to transfer venue #22 is granted. Oral argument is set for 7/13/2021 at 02:00 p.m. and will be conducted via video-conference. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 650-479-3207 the meeting number/access code is 180 659 3247. Counsel of record will receive an email invitation prior to the start of the video hearing with instructions to join the video conference. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notices mailed by judge's staff. (rbf, ) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18255812. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Abdelnour, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

95 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/13/2021: Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc.'s motion for leave to file under seal #46 is granted. (rbf, ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Oral argument set for 7/13/2021 at 02:00 p.m. is stricken and reset for 07/23/2021 at 11:00 a.m. and will be conducted via video-conference. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 650-479-3207 the meeting number/access code is 180 659 3247. Counsel of record will receive an email invitation prior to the start of the video hearing with instructions to join the video conference. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. (rbf, ) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION by Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. to seal document reply, #45 (Shimota, James) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) SEALED REPLY by Lynk Labs, Inc. to SEALED MOTION by Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. Motion to Strike Certain Allegations, to Dismiss Counts IV and IX for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and to Transfer Venue #24 Defendant's Reply in Support (Unredacted) (Shimota, James) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) REPLY by Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. to motion to dismiss #22 Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Certain Allegations, to Dismiss Counts IV and IX for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and to Transfer Venue (Public/Redacted) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nelson Hua, #2 Ex. A to Hua Declaration, #3 Ex. B to Hua Declaration, #4 Ex. C to Hua Declaration, #5 Ex. D to Hua Declaration)(Shimota, James) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer:The parties' request for an oral argument on defendant, Lynk Labs' motion to strike certain allegations to dismiss counts IV and IX for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and to transfer venue #22 is granted. Oral argument is set for 7/13/2021 at 02:00 p.m. and will be conducted via video-conference. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 650-479-3207 the meeting number/access code is 180 659 3247. Counsel of record will receive an email invitation prior to the start of the video hearing with instructions to join the video conference. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notices mailed by judge's staff. (rbf, ) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file under seal #41 is granted. Notices mailed by judge's staff. (rbf, ) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION by Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. to seal document sealed response, #39 , sealed document,, #40 - Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike, Dismiss and Transfer; Declaration of Xin-Yi Zhou; Exhibits 3-6 Zhou Declaration (Yagura, Ryan) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. - Declaration of Xin-Yi Zhou In Support of Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Lynk Lab's Motion to Strike, Dismiss and Transfer (Unredacted) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 Zhou Declaration (Unredacted), #2 Exhibit 4 Zhou Declaration (Unredacted), #3 Exhibit 5 Zhou Declaration (Unredacted), #4 Exhibit 6 Zhou Declaration (Unredacted))(Yagura, Ryan) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) SEALED RESPONSE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. to response in opposition to motion,,,,, #38 Samsung's Opposition to Lynk Labs, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Certain Allegations, to Dismiss Counts IV and IX for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and to Transfer Venue (Unredacted) (Yagura, Ryan) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18261384. (Zhou, Xin-Yi) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Lynk Labs, Inc. (cm, ) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (gw, ) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lxk, ) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Claims Involving a Patent by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Abdelnour, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. (Abdelnour, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by Ron N. Sklar (Sklar, Ron) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by Dennis John Abdelnour (Abdelnour, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Abdelnour, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18255812. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Abdelnour, Dennis) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ron N. Sklar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc J Pensabene

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis J. Abdelnour(Designation Retained)