This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/22/2023 at 02:01:31 (UTC).

Sampson v. National Board of Medical Examiners

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 Sampson filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against National Board of Medical Examiners. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anne Y. Shields and Joan M. Azrack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-05120

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anne Y. Shields

Presiding Judge

Joan M. Azrack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Sampson

Defendant

National Board of Medical Examiners

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Weiner

Michael S. Stein

Mary Caroline Vargas

Defendant Attorneys

Caroline M. Mew

Adam Ross Mandelsberg

 

Court Documents

16 #9

Exhibit 10 Aronson Letter

16 #8

Exhibit 9 DeMotta Letter 2018

16 #7

Exhibit 8 DeMotta Letter 2017

16 #4

Exhibit 5 Unofficial Transcript

16 #3

Exhibit 1 Declaration of Robert Sampson

16 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Weiner on behalf of Robert Sampson (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Weiner, Charles) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against National Board of Medical Examiners filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15887153 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Robert Sampson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Vargas, Mary) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#41

(#41) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint by National Board of Medical Examiners. (Mandelsberg, Adam) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#40

RESTRICTED

#39

(#39) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Joan M. Azrack: Civil Cause for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING re 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff: Mary Vargas, Charles Weiner; For Defendants: Caroline Mew, Adam Mandelsberg. Case called. Counsel present for all sides. Witness continued. Exhibits entered into evidence. Hearing concluded. Decision reserved. Other: Findings of fact and conclusions of law due by close of business on 10/31/2022. ((Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (LC) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to National Board of Medical Examiners. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Robert Sampson (Vargas, Mary) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 14, 2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/20/2022. (DM) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint by National Board of Medical Examiners. (Mandelsberg, Adam) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Exhibit List by National Board of Medical Examiners, Robert Sampson.; Witness List by National Board of Medical Examiners, Robert Sampson. (LC) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Joan M. Azrack: Civil Cause for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING re 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff: Mary Vargas, Charles Weiner; For Defendants: Caroline Mew, Adam Mandelsberg. Case called. Counsel present for all sides. Witness continued. Exhibits entered into evidence. Hearing concluded. Decision reserved. Other: Findings of fact and conclusions of law due by close of business on 10/31/2022. ((Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (LC) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Joan M. Azrack: Civil Cause for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 10/12/2022 re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff: Mary Vargas, Charles WeinerFor Defendants: Caroline Mew, Adam Mandelsberg Case called. Counsel present for all sides. Witnesses sworn, exhibits entered into evidence. Hearing continued to 10/13/2022 at 9:00 AM. (LC) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Joan M. Azrack: Civil Cause for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 10/11/2022 re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Counsel for Plaintiff: Mary Vargas, Charles Weiner. Counsel for Defendants: Caroline Mew, Adam Mandelsberg. Case called. Counsel present for all sides. Opening statements of plaintiff and defendant heard. Witnesses sworn, exhibits entered into evidence. Hearing continued to 10/12/2022 at 9:30 AM. (LC) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Exhibit List and Witness List by National Board of Medical Examiners. (Mew, Caroline) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Exhibit List by Robert Sampson. (Vargas, Mary) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Witness List by Robert Sampson (Vargas, Mary) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) REPLY in Support (Correction to ECF No. #32 ) re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Robert Sampson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Shelley Sampson, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Andrew Lam and Attached Letter) (Vargas, Mary) Modified on 10/5/2022 at the request of counsel to more clearly reflect the document filed herein is a correction to the #32 Reply and contains a page that was inadvertently omitted from #32 -2 (LC). (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Robert Sampson. (Vargas, Mary) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Sampson. National Board of Medical Examiners served on 8/31/2022, answer due 9/21/2022. (Vargas, Mary) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Weiner on behalf of Robert Sampson (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Weiner, Charles) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to National Board of Medical Examiners. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketThis attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Robert Sampson (Vargas, Mary) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against National Board of Medical Examiners filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15887153 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Robert Sampson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Vargas, Mary) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less