This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 17:38:59 (UTC).

Samia v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Samia filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas J. Whelan and William V. Gallo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01015

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas J. Whelan

Referral Judge

William V. Gallo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Albert Samia

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

USAA Federal Savings Bank

Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC

Trans Union LLC

Does 1 through 10

Bank of America, N.A.

BMW Financial Services NA, Inc.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

BBVA USA doing business as Compass Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremy Golden

Attorney at Golden & Cardona-Loya, LLP

3130 Bonita Road, Suite 200-B

Chula Vista, CA 91910-3263

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew R. Fox

Attorney at Jones Day

4655 Executive Drive

San Diego, CA 92121

Joshua Nathan Kastan

Attorney at DKM Law Group, LLP

535 Pacific Avenue, Suite 101

San Francisco, CA 94133

Melissa L. O'Connor

Attorney at DKM Law Group LLP

201 Spear Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Alisa Alexandra Givental

Attorney at Severson & Werson

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jennifer Rebecca Bergh

Attorney at Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, P.C.

6900 Dallas Parkway, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

Elizabeth Christine Hehir

Attorney at McGuirewoods

1800 Century Park East, 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Arjun P. Rao

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

2029 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Thomas P Quinn, Jr

Attorney at Nokes and Quinn

410 Broadway, Suite 200

Laguna Beach, CA 92651

Parisa Jassim

Attorney at Akerman, LLP

601 West Fifth Street, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

16 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismis

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. (Givental, Alisa) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Order Granting Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc. #22 ). The Court grants the joint motion and orders Defendant to respond to the complaint on or before 8/19/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 7/22/2021. (jrm) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. (Givental, Alisa) (jrm). (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER Granting Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Docs. {19], #20 ). BBVA USA answer due 8/19/2021; BMW Financial Services NA, Inc. answer due 8/19/2021. The Court grants the joint motions and orders Defendants to respond to the complaint on or before 8/19/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 7/20/2021. (jrm) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by BMW Financial Services NA, Inc.. (Rao, Arjun)Attorney Arjun P. Rao added to party BMW Financial Services NA, Inc.(pty:dft)(jrm). (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by BBVA USA. (Jassim, Parisa)Attorney Parisa Jassim added to party BBVA USA (pty:dft) (jrm). (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Settlement by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Quinn, Thomas)(jrm). (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trans Union LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer) (jrm). (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Kastan, Joshua)Attorney Joshua Nathan Kastan added to party USAA Federal Savings Bank(pty:dft) (jrm). (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc. #11 ). Trans Union LLC answer due 7/15/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 6/25/2021. (jrm) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order Granting Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Docs. #5 , #6 ). The Court grants the joint motions and orders Defendants to respond to the complaint on or before 7/26/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 6/24/2021. (jrm) (Main Document 10 replaced; NEF regenerated on 6/24/2021) (jrm). (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Fox, Matthew) (jrm). (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Demand for Jury Trial, and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Fox, Matthew)Attorney Matthew R. Fox added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (jrm). (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.. (Quinn, Thomas)(jrm). (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Quinn, Thomas)Attorney Thomas P Quinn, Jr added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft) (jrm). (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. (Givental, Alisa)Attorney Alisa Alexandra Givental added to party Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC(pty:dft)(jrm). (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Granting Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. USAA Federal Savings Bank answer due 7/15/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 6/22/2021. (jrm) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (O'Connor, Melissa)Attorney Melissa L. O'Connor added to party USAA Federal Savings Bank(pty:dft) (jrm). (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (fth) (rmc). (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15771512.), filed by Albert Samia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1015-W-WVG. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Golden, Jeremy) (fth) (rmc). (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS SERVICER FOR DAIMLER TRUST A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant