This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2020 at 09:00:05 (UTC).

Samano v. Little Alley Steak, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Samano filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Little Alley Steak, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael L. Brown and Catherine M. Salinas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01483

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

Referral Judge

Catherine M. Salinas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Isela Ostio Samano

Defendants

F & H Food Trading Group, Inc.

Little Alley Steak, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick J. Hannon

Attorney at Patrick Hannon

400 Galleria Parkway, Ste 1150

Atlanta, GA 30339

Defendant Attorney

David Evan Baum

Attorney at Baum & Associates

1570 Warsaw Road

Roswell, GA 30076

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#9

(#9) SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by F & H Food Trading Group, Inc. and Little Alley Steak, LLC. Discovery ends on 10/1/2020.(Baum, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 5/4/2020 to add filer (jpa). (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed by Isela Ostio Samano. F & H Food Trading Group, Inc. served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Hannon, Patrick) Modified on 4/16/2020 to edit deadlines (dob). (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed by Isela Ostio Samano. Little Alley Steak, LLC served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Hannon, Patrick) Modified on 4/16/2020 to edit deadlines (dob). (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#5

(#5) Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/30/2020. (rvb) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#4

(#4) GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (eop) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to F & H Food Trading Group, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Little Alley Steak, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Isela Ostio Samano. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9570244) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 4/8/2020 to correct filer's name (eop). (Entered: 04/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by F & H Food Trading Group, Inc. and Little Alley Steak, LLC. Discovery ends on 10/1/2020.(Baum, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 5/4/2020 to add filer (jpa). (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction re #6 Return of Service Executed, #7 Return of Service Executed. Serve dates and deadlines reset by Clerk to reflect PDF. (dob) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed by Isela Ostio Samano. F & H Food Trading Group, Inc. served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Hannon, Patrick) Modified on 4/16/2020 to edit deadlines (dob). (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed by Isela Ostio Samano. Little Alley Steak, LLC served on 4/13/2020, answer due 5/4/2020. (Hannon, Patrick) Modified on 4/16/2020 to edit deadlines (dob). (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/30/2020. (rvb) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (eop) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to F & H Food Trading Group, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Little Alley Steak, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Isela Ostio Samano. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9570244) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 4/8/2020 to correct filer's name (eop). (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less