This case was last updated from PACER on 12/07/2019 at 07:35:55 (UTC).

Saltatrix LLC et al v. Pimel Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 Saltatrix LLC filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Pimel Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel R. Dominguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01951

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel R. Dominguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Saltatrix LLC

Reid Contractors LLC

James Flannery Trucking LLC

Defendant

PIMEL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jorge L. Marchand-Heredia

Po Box 364273

San Juan, PR 00936-4273

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Pimel Corporation (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified on 10/10/2019 edit text (gav). (Entered: 10/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Pimel Corporation (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified on 10/10/2019 edit text (gav). (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6628496.), filed by Saltatrix LLC, James Flannery Trucking LLC, Reid Contractors LLC. Service due by 1/6/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons)(Marchand-Heredia, Jorge) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.