This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:26:37 (UTC).

Salmeron v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Salmeron filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan M. Azrack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00069

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan M. Azrack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosa M. Salmeron

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles E. Binder

Attorney at Law Offices of Charles E. Binder and Harry J. Binder, LLP

485 Madison Ave. Suite 501

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorneys

Anne Zeigler

Attorney at SSA/Ogc

601 E. 12Th St., Room 965

Kansas City, MO 64106

SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC

Attorney at Social Security Administration

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosa M. Salmeron. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (Binder, Charles) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Zeigler Anne on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Anne, Zeigler) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons-U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons-U.S. Attorney General) (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12217876 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Rosa M. Salmeron. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Binder, Charles) Modified on 1/7/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.