This case was last updated from PACER on 09/27/2021 at 08:24:33 (UTC).

Sallies v. The First Liberty Insurance Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 Sallies filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against The First Liberty Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aileen M. Cannon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-14305

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aileen M. Cannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steve Sallies

Defendant

The First Liberty Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Philip Rudd

Attorney at Morgan and Morgan

20 N. Organge Ave

Orlando, FL 32801

Stephen A. Marino, Jr.

Attorney at Ver Ploeg & Marino, P.A.

100 S.E. Second Street, Suite 3300

Miami, FL 33131-2154

Ady Goss

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, P.A.

20 North Orange Avenue, Suite 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

Michael William Hoffman

301 E Pine St, Suite 790

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew John Lavisky

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

400 North Ashley Drive, Suite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

Jamie Rebecca Combee

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

400 North Ashley Drive, Suite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Transmittal Letter Sent with Order Granting Motion to Remand to: 19th Judicial Circuit, Indian River County, FL. State Court Case Number: 31-02019-CS-000421 (drz) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#15

(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand and For Attorney's Fees filed by Steve Sallies. (Marino, Stephen) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

14 #1

Exhibit Gentry v. State Farm Order

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Steve Sallies (Marino, Stephen) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#12

(#12) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Steve Sallies (Hoffman, Michael) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael William Hoffman on behalf of Steve Sallies (Hoffman, Michael) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

10 #2

Exhibit B- Order

10 #1

Exhibit A- Motion

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael William Hoffman on behalf of Steve Sallies. Attorney Michael William Hoffman added to party Steve Sallies(pty:pla). (Hoffman, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

8 #8

Exhibit Exhibit A - 8

8 #7

Exhibit Exhibit A - 7

8 #6

Exhibit Exhibit A - 6

8 #5

Exhibit Exhibit A - 5

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - 1

#6

(#6) Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases ( Status Report due by 8/16/2021.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 8/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (sk) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Transmittal Letter Sent with Order Granting Motion to Remand to: 19th Judicial Circuit, Indian River County, FL. State Court Case Number: 31-02019-CS-000421 (drz) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per Order of Remand DE#16 . Closing Case. (drz) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand and For Attorney's Fees filed by Steve Sallies. (Marino, Stephen) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand and For Attorney's Fees filed by The First Liberty Insurance Corporation. Replies due by 9/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gentry v. State Farm Order)(Lavisky, Matthew) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Steve Sallies (Marino, Stephen) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Steve Sallies (Hoffman, Michael) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael William Hoffman on behalf of Steve Sallies (Hoffman, Michael) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand and For Attorney's Fees by Steve Sallies. Attorney Stephen A. Marino, Jr added to party Steve Sallies(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Motion, #2 Exhibit B- Order)(Marino, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael William Hoffman on behalf of Steve Sallies. Attorney Michael William Hoffman added to party Steve Sallies(pty:pla). (Hoffman, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by The First Liberty Insurance Corporation re #6 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other, Set/Reset Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A - 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A - 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A - 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A - 8) (Lavisky, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS REPORT Removal Status Report by The First Liberty Insurance Corporation (Lavisky, Matthew) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases ( Status Report due by 8/16/2021.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 8/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (sk) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/30/2021 Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 8/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Ady Goss, mailing date July 30, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14886468, filed by The First Liberty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Lavisky, Matthew) Modified Text on 7/30/2021 (drz). ( Amended Final Judgment Listed in DE#1-6, Notice of Voluntary Dismissal listed in DE#1-4) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE FIRST LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamie Rebecca Combee

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEW JOHN LAVISKY