Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 07:20:12 (UTC).

Salley v. Gladieux

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 Salley filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Gladieux. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William C Lee and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00224

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Lee

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dennis Salley

Dennis L Salley

Defendants

Allen County Sheriff David Gladieux

444 E. Main Street

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

David Gladieux

Not Classified By Court

C Erik Chickedantz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher C Myers

Attorney at Christopher C Myers & Associates

809 S Calhoun St Ste 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Ilene M Smith

Attorney at Christopher C Myers & Associates

809 S Calhoun St Ste 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorney

J Spencer Feighner

Attorney at Haller & Colvin PC

444 E Main St

Fort Wayne, IN 46802-1910

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE . (Feighner, J) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Feighner, J) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#9

(#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (mr) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Gladieux. David Gladieux waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Feighner, J) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by J Spencer Feighner on behalf of David Gladieux (Feighner, J) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

5 #2

Complaint

5 #1

Order

#5

(#5) NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to David Gladieux. Waiver of Service due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (cc: Dft)(lns) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pla Dennis L Salley and DEFERRING payment of the filing fee. Pla to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery received in this case. Clerk and USMS to issue and serve process at Allen County Jail. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 5/23/2019. (lns) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ilene M Smith on behalf of Salley Dennis (Smith, Ilene) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Salley Dennis. (Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

1 #4

Proposed Summons USM285

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Allen County Sheriff David Gladieux, filed by Salley Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons USM285)(Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/26/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared with atty Christopher Myers. Atty Spencer Feighner and Captain John Zaglemeier appeared on behalf of the Dft. The #10 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 5/8/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Erik Chickedantz appointed as Mediator. Atty Myers to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Feighner. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 7/17/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE . (Feighner, J) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Feighner, J) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (mr) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Gladieux. David Gladieux waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Feighner, J) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by J Spencer Feighner on behalf of David Gladieux (Feighner, J) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to David Gladieux. Waiver of Service due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (cc: Dft)(lns) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pla Dennis L Salley and DEFERRING payment of the filing fee. Pla to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery received in this case. Clerk and USMS to issue and serve process at Allen County Jail. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 5/23/2019. (lns) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (New Case) (IFP Motion Pending) (sct) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ilene M Smith on behalf of Salley Dennis (Smith, Ilene) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Salley Dennis. (Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Allen County Sheriff David Gladieux, filed by Salley Dennis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons USM285)(Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer J Spencer Feighner