This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:37:19 (UTC).

Ruthann Salles v. Costco Wholesale Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Ruthann Salles filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Costco Wholesale Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Suzanne H. Segal and John F. Walter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Suzanne H. Segal

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruthann Salles

Defendants

Costco Wholesale Corporation

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Costco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cary Michael Johnson

Attorney at Law Offices of Cary M Johnson

535 South Curson Avenue Suite 7M

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa D Angelo

Attorney at Murchison and Cumming LLP

801 South Grand Avenue 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jonathan E Tarkowski

Attorney at Murchison and Cumming LLP

801 South Grand Avenue 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-4613

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit B - Service of Process

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2020 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 9/11/2020 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 9/15/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on February 10, 2020 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: May 4, 2020. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: May 8, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #4

Declaration

#4

(#4) Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party and Notice to State Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Angelo, Lisa) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Angelo, Lisa) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, identifying None. (Angelo, Lisa) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Angelo, Lisa) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Misc Documents served with Complaint

#10

(#10) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Ruthann Salles.. (Johnson, Cary) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV43717 Receipt No: 0973-25067478 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C - Misc Documents served with Complaint, #4 Declaration) (Attorney Lisa D Angelo added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft))(Angelo, Lisa) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for February 10, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before January 27, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2020 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 9/11/2020 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 9/15/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on February 10, 2020 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: May 4, 2020. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: May 8, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Ruthann Salles.. (Johnson, Cary) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Angelo, Lisa) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for February 10, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before January 27, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff Ruthann Salles, upon Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation served on 12/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service, by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COP9Y OF COMPLAINT against defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Does, filed by plaintiff Ruthann Salles. (filed in state court 12/4/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party and Notice to State Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Angelo, Lisa) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, identifying None. (Angelo, Lisa) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Angelo, Lisa) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV43717 Receipt No: 0973-25067478 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C - Misc Documents served with Complaint, #4 Declaration) (Attorney Lisa D Angelo added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft))(Angelo, Lisa) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.