This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/16/2021 at 11:55:06 (UTC).

Salinas v. TKC Holdings et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 Salinas filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against TKC Holdings. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney W. Sippel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01846

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney W. Sippel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luis S. Salinas

Louisiana, MO 63353

Defendants

MyCarePak

TKC Holdings

TTO

Keefe Group Trinity Services

Access Corrections/SecurePak

CSR

Keefe Group

Trinity Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel S Kim

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC - St Louis

222 S. Central Ave., Suite 900

St. Louis, MO 63105

Thomas E. Berry, Jr.

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC - St Louis

222 S. Central Ave., Suite 900

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Envelope

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 13. Wed Feb 3 08:28:06 CST 2021 (Phillips, Nicole) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants Keefe Group, TKC Holdings. (Kim, Rachel) filed by Keefe Group, TKC Holdings ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/3/2021. (NEP) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Keefe Group. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Kim, Rachel) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant TKC Holdings. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Kim, Rachel) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants Keefe Group, TKC Holdings. (Kim, Rachel) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel S Kim for Defendants Keefe Group, TKC Holdings. (Kim, Rachel) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas E. Berry, Jr for Defendants Keefe Group, TKC Holdings. (Berry, Thomas) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Luis S. Salinas. Keefe Group served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Luis S. Salinas. TKC Holdings served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to defendant Keefe Group, TKC Holdings. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (ANP) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4, 5. Thu Dec 31 09:57:34 CST 2020 (Petri, Alexis) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Trinity Services, MyCarePak, Access Corrections/SecurePak, TTO, and CSR are DISMISSED from this action, without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this partial dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/31/2020. MyCarePak, TTO, Trinity Services, Access Corrections/SecurePak and CSR (& More) terminated. (ANP) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Pro Bono Limited Scope Counsel (ECF No. #3 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Trinity Services, MyCarePak, Access Corrections/SecurePak, TTO, and CSR are DISMISSED from this action, without prejudice. A separate order of partial dismissal will be entered herewith.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants TKC Holdings and Keefe Group via their registered agent, Cogency Global, Inc., 9666 Olive Boulevard, Suite 690, Saint Louis, Missouri, 63132. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/31/2020. (ANP) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Dec 21 13:03:02 CST 2020 (admin,) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (JWD) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Appointment of Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Pro Bono Limited Scope Counsel by Plaintiff Luis S. Salinas. (JWD) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Luis S. Salinas. (JWD) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Luis S. Salinas. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(JWD) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TKC HOLDINGS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Keefe Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TRINITY SERVICES GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CSR LIMITED is a litigant