This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2021 at 07:06:39 (UTC).

Salinas v. LFS Development, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Salinas filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against LFS Development, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Bernard G. Skomal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00298

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Ann Bencivengo

Referral Judge

Bernard G. Skomal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gilbert Salinas

Defendants

Does 1-10

LFS Development, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Faythe Gutierrez

Attorney at Potter Handy, LLP

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Isabel Rose Masanque

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Jan Nicholas Marfori

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

400 South Hope Street, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER Granting Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint [Doc. No. #8 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/23/2021. (anh) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#8

(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by LFS Development, LLC. (Marfori, Jan) (anh). (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER Granting In Part Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint [Doc. No. #4 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/25/2021. (anh) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#4

(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendant to Respond to Initial Complaint by LFS Development, LLC. (Marfori, Jan) (anh). (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LFS Development, LLC identifying Corporate Parent LPP Lane Field South, LLC, Corporate Parent Winslow Investment Corporation. for LFS Development, LLC. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by LFS Development, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate LFS Intermediate Co., LLC, Other Affiliate Lane Field South Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate LPP Lane Field South, LLC, Other Affiliate Winslow Investment Corporation for LFS Development, LLC. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by LFS Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Marfori, Jan) (anh). (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint [Doc. No. #8 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/23/2021. (anh) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by LFS Development, LLC. (Marfori, Jan) (anh). (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Isabel Rose Masanque on behalf of Gilbert Salinas (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Masanque, Isabel Rose)Attorney Isabel Rose Masanque added to party Gilbert Salinas(pty:pla) (anh). (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Faythe Gutierrez on behalf of Gilbert Salinas (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gutierrez, Faythe)Attorney Faythe Gutierrez added to party Gilbert Salinas(pty:pla) (anh). (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Granting In Part Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint [Doc. No. #4 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/25/2021. (anh) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendant to Respond to Initial Complaint by LFS Development, LLC. (Marfori, Jan) (anh). (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LFS Development, LLC identifying Corporate Parent LPP Lane Field South, LLC, Corporate Parent Winslow Investment Corporation. for LFS Development, LLC. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by LFS Development, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate LFS Intermediate Co., LLC, Other Affiliate Lane Field South Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate LPP Lane Field South, LLC, Other Affiliate Winslow Investment Corporation for LFS Development, LLC. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-15402680.), filed by LFS Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Supplement Certificate of Service)The new case number is 3:21-cv-298-CAB-BGS. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jan Nicholas Marfori