This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2021 at 07:05:39 (UTC).

Salinas v. CHSP San Diego LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Salinas filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against CHSP San Diego LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allison H. Goddard and Anthony J. Battaglia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00292

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Allison H. Goddard

Presiding Judge

Anthony J. Battaglia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gilbert Salinas

Defendants

Does 1-10

CHSP San Diego LLC

CHSP TRS San Diego LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Faythe Gutierrez

Attorney at Potter Handy, LLP

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Isabel Rose Masanque

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Jan Nicholas Marfori

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

400 South Hope Street, Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Initial Complaint. The time for defendants CHSP San Diego LLC and CHSP TRS San Diego LLC to respond to the initial complaint in this case is extended to and including 3/25/2021. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/25/2021. (jrm) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Initial Complaint by CHSP San Diego LLC, CHSP TRS San Diego LLC. (Marfori, Jan) (jrm). (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Isabel Rose Masanque on behalf of Gilbert Salinas (Masanque, Isabel Rose)Attorney Isabel Rose Masanque added to party Gilbert Salinas(pty:pla) (jrm). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Faythe Gutierrez on behalf of Gilbert Salinas (Gutierrez, Faythe)Attorney Faythe Gutierrez added to party Gilbert Salinas(pty:pla)(jrm). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by CHSP San Diego LLC, CHSP TRS San Diego LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent Park Hotels & Resorts Inc. for CHSP San Diego LLC, CHSP TRS San Diego LLC. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHSP San Diego LLC, CHSP TRS San Diego LLC identifying Corporate Parent Park Hotels & Resorts Inc. for CHSP San Diego LLC, CHSP TRS San Diego LLC. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(B)(6) filed by CHSP San Diego LLC, CHSP TRS San Diego LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to RJN ISO Reply, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to RJN ISO Reply)(Marfori, Jan) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Gilbert Salinas. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Best, Zachary) (jrm). (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(B)(6) : Responses due by 4/9/2021; Replies due by 4/16/2021; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (sc) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by CHSP San Diego LLC, CHSP TRS San Diego LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(B)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Marfori, Jan) (jrm). (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(B)(6) by CHSP San Diego LLC, CHSP TRS San Diego LLC. (Attachments: #1 DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. RULE 12(B)(6))(Marfori, Jan) (jrm). (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CHSP San Diego LLC, CHSP TRS San Diego LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Service Re Notice to Adverse Party and Clerk of the California Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marfori, Jan) (jrm). (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Initial Complaint. The time for defendants CHSP San Diego LLC and CHSP TRS San Diego LLC to respond to the initial complaint in this case is extended to and including 3/25/2021. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/25/2021. (jrm) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Initial Complaint by CHSP San Diego LLC, CHSP TRS San Diego LLC. (Marfori, Jan) (jrm). (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Isabel Rose Masanque on behalf of Gilbert Salinas (Masanque, Isabel Rose)Attorney Isabel Rose Masanque added to party Gilbert Salinas(pty:pla) (jrm). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Faythe Gutierrez on behalf of Gilbert Salinas (Gutierrez, Faythe)Attorney Faythe Gutierrez added to party Gilbert Salinas(pty:pla)(jrm). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docket(#4) Fee for Civil Case Opening: $ 402, receipt number ACASDC-15406038, Paid on 2/19/2021. (no document attached) (Marfori, Jan) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by CHSP San Diego LLC, CHSP TRS San Diego LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent Park Hotels & Resorts Inc. for CHSP San Diego LLC, CHSP TRS San Diego LLC. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHSP San Diego LLC, CHSP TRS San Diego LLC identifying Corporate Parent Park Hotels & Resorts Inc. for CHSP San Diego LLC, CHSP TRS San Diego LLC. (zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee DUE $402.00.), filed by CHSP San Diego LLC, CHSP TRS San Diego LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B- Served Documents, #4 Certificate of Service)The new case number is 3:21-cv-292-AJB-AHG. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(zda)(jrd) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jan Nicholas Marfori