3:22-CV-04823
08/23/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Other Contract
Jacqueline Scott Corley
Michelle Salinas
Raymel Washington
Block, Inc.
Cash App Investing, LLC
Daniel E. Gustafson
David Allen Goodwin
Gary S. Graifman
Mary Margaret Nikolai
Melissa R. Emert
Scott David Hirsch
Dennis Stewart
Aravind Swaminathan
Rebecca Clair Harlow
Trial Log
Main Document
Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Main Document
(#29) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Block, Inc., Cash App Investing, LLC.. (Swaminathan, Aravind) (Filed on 10/3/2022) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
(#28) ***DISREGARD, DOCUMENT FILED IN THE WRONG CASE*** ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED in the Amount of $897,827.99 Against Le Garden HB, LLC and Brent Wei-Teh Lee. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2022) Modified on 9/26/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/23/2022)
(#27) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #26 Aravind Swaminathan's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2022) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
Certificate of Good Standing
Main Document
Certificate of Good Standing
Main Document
Certificate of Good Standing
Main Document
(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2022) (Entered: 08/23/2022)
(#4) Summons Issued as to Block, Inc., Cash App Investing, LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2022) (Entered: 08/23/2022)
(#2) Proposed Summons. (Stewart, Dennis) (Filed on 8/23/2022) (Entered: 08/23/2022)
Civil Cover Sheet
Main Document
Docket(#32) CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2022. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/5/2023 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanc ed notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 1/4/2023.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding In-Pe rson Hearing) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2022) (Entered: 10/04/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#31) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 10/03/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2022) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#30) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2022) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#29) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Block, Inc., Cash App Investing, LLC.. (Swaminathan, Aravind) (Filed on 10/3/2022) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#28) ***DISREGARD, DOCUMENT FILED IN THE WRONG CASE*** ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED in the Amount of $897,827.99 Against Le Garden HB, LLC and Brent Wei-Teh Lee. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2022) Modified on 9/26/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/23/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#27) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #26 Aravind Swaminathan's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2022) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#26) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Aravind Swaminathan on Behalf of Block, Inc. and Cash App Investing, LLC ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17543860.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/16/2022 filed by Block, Inc., Cash App Investing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Swaminathan, Aravind) (Filed on 9/22/2022) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#25) ORDER (AS MODIFIED) re #22 granting Stipulation to Modify Case Schedule: the time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 11/6/2022; parties shall file a joint Case Management Statement by 12/28/2022 and the Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 11/30/2022 01:30 PM is vacated and continued to 1/4/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. All counsel and parties may access the webinar information at https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/ryu-donna-m-dmr/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/19/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2022) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket#Electronic filing error. Contact information listed on Application does not match listed information in ECF. Please update contact information in ECF or refile Pro Hac Vice Applic ation. [err102] Re: #23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $317, receipt number ACANDC-17543860.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/16/2022 filed by Cash App Investing, LLC, Block, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2022) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#24) CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2022) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Scott D. Hirsch ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17489901.) filed by Michelle Salinas, Raymel Washington. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hirsch, Scott) (Filed on 8/30/2022) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David Allen Goodwin.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Daniel E. Gustafson.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17486712.) filed by Michelle Salinas, Raymel Washington. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goodwin, David) (Filed on 8/29/2022) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17486225.) filed by Michelle Salinas, Raymel Washington. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gustafson, Daniel) (Filed on 8/29/2022) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2022) (Entered: 08/23/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Summons Issued as to Block, Inc., Cash App Investing, LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2022) (Entered: 08/23/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/6/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2022) (Entered: 08/23/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Stewart, Dennis) (Filed on 8/23/2022) (Entered: 08/23/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Block, Inc., Cash App Investing, LLC (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17468309). Filed by Michelle Salinas, Raymel Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stewart, Dennis) (Filed on 8/23/2022) Modified on 8/23/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/23/2022)
[-] Read Less